Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 03/11/2014
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 03/11/2014
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-13] 03/11/2014
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-3] 03/11/2014
Rep. Wilson, Frederica S. [D-FL-24] 03/11/2014
Rep. Titus, Dina [D-NV-1] 03/11/2014
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 03/11/2014
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-35] 03/11/2014
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-20] 03/11/2014
Rep. Grimm, Michael G. [R-NY-11] 03/11/2014
Rep. Clark, Katherine M. [D-MA-5] 03/13/2014
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-20] 03/13/2014
Rep. O'Rourke, Beto [D-TX-16] 03/13/2014
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13] 03/13/2014
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 03/13/2014
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 03/13/2014
Rep. Hanabusa, Colleen W. [D-HI-1] 03/13/2014
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 03/13/2014
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 03/24/2014
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 03/24/2014
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-27] 03/24/2014
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-13] 03/24/2014
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2] 04/01/2014
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 04/01/2014
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-25] 04/01/2014
Rep. Cardenas, Tony [D-CA-29] 04/01/2014
Rep. Quigley, Mike [D-IL-5] 04/01/2014
Rep. Deutch, Theodore E. [D-FL-21] 04/01/2014
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-13] 04/01/2014
Rep. Himes, James A. [D-CT-4] 04/01/2014
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-28] 04/08/2014
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 04/08/2014
Rep. DelBene, Suzan K. [D-WA-1] 04/08/2014
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1] 04/08/2014
Rep. Bera, Ami [D-CA-7] 04/08/2014
Rep. Foster, Bill [D-IL-11] 04/28/2014
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1] 04/28/2014
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-7] 04/28/2014
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 04/28/2014
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-11] 04/28/2014
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-19] 04/30/2014
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-9] 05/20/2014
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 05/20/2014
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 05/20/2014
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-14] 05/20/2014
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 06/18/2014
Rep. Cartwright, Matt [D-PA-17] 06/24/2014
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-8] 07/10/2014
Rep. Esty, Elizabeth H. [D-CT-5] 07/10/2014
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-14] 07/17/2014
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-17] 07/22/2014
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 07/22/2014
Rep. Delaney, John K. [D-MD-6] 07/25/2014
Rep. Negrete McLeod, Gloria [D-CA-35] 07/31/2014
Rep. Kilmer, Derek [D-WA-6] 09/09/2014
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 11/14/2014