Refine your search

7 results for Actions Overview
Date Actions Overview
04/03/2014 Became Public Law No: 113-95.
04/03/2014 Signed by President.
04/03/2014 Presented to President.
04/01/2014 Resolving differences -- House actions: On motion that the House suspend the rules and agree to the Senate amendment Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays (2/3 required): 378 - 34 (Roll No. 149).(text as House agreed to Senate amendment: CR H2752-2755)
03/27/2014 Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate with an amendment by Voice Vote.
03/06/2014 Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 385 - 23 (Roll no. 114).(text: CR H2215)
03/05/2014 Introduced in House