Refine your search

30 results for All Actions
Date Chamber All Actions
04/09/2014 Committee on Commission on Security and Cooperation in Europe. Hearings held.
Type of Action: Committee Consideration
Action By: The Helsinki Commission
04/03/2014 Became Public Law No: 113-95.
04/03/2014 Signed by President.
04/03/2014 House Presented to President.
04/01/2014-6:56pm House Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
Type of Action: Resolving Differences
04/01/2014-6:56pm House On motion that the House suspend the rules and agree to the Senate amendment Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays (2/3 required): 378 - 34 (Roll No. 149). (text as House agreed to Senate amendment: CR H2752-2755)
Type of Action: Resolving Differences
04/01/2014-6:31pm House Considered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H2784-2785)
Type of Action: Floor Consideration
04/01/2014-4:20pm House At the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed.
Type of Action: Resolving Differences
04/01/2014-4:07pm House DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on the motion to suspend the rules and concur in the Senate amendment to H.R. 4152.
Type of Action: Floor Consideration
04/01/2014-4:07pm House Mr. Royce moved that the House suspend the rules and concur to the Senate amendment. (consideration: CR H2752-2756)
Type of Action: Resolving Differences
03/27/2014 Senate Message on Senate action sent to the House.
Type of Action: Floor Consideration
03/27/2014 Senate Passed Senate with an amendment by Voice Vote.
Type of Action: Floor Consideration
03/27/2014 Senate S.Amdt.2867 Amendment SA 2867 agreed to in Senate by Yea-Nay Vote. 98 - 2. Record Vote Number: 88.
Type of Action: Floor Consideration
03/27/2014 Senate S.Amdt.2867 Considered by Senate. (consideration: CR S1785-1792)
Type of Action: Floor Consideration
03/27/2014 Senate Considered by Senate. (consideration: CR S1785-1792)
Type of Action: Floor Consideration
03/25/2014 Senate S.Amdt.2867 Amendment SA 2867 proposed by Senator Reid for Senator Menendez. (consideration: CR S1720)
Type of Action: Floor Consideration
03/25/2014 Senate Measure laid before Senate by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR S1720)
Type of Action: Floor Consideration
03/12/2014 Senate Read the second time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 328.
Type of Action: Calendars
03/11/2014 Senate Read the first time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under Read the First Time.
Type of Action: Calendars
03/10/2014 Senate Received in the Senate.
Type of Action: Introduction and Referral
03/06/2014-3:02pm House On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 385 - 23 (Roll no. 114). (text: CR H2215)
Type of Action: Floor Consideration
03/06/2014-2:55pm House Considered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H2243-2244)
Type of Action: Floor Consideration
03/06/2014-11:53am House At the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed.
Type of Action: Floor Consideration
03/06/2014-11:18am House DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 4152.
Type of Action: Floor Consideration
03/06/2014-11:18am House Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H2215-2219)
Type of Action: Floor Consideration
03/06/2014-11:18am House Mr. Rogers (KY) moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
Type of Action: Floor Consideration
03/05/2014 House Referred to House Foreign Affairs
Type of Action: Introduction and Referral
03/05/2014 House Referred to House Appropriations
Type of Action: Introduction and Referral
03/05/2014 House Referred to the Committee on Appropriations, and in addition to the Committee on Foreign Affairs, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Type of Action: Introduction and Referral
03/05/2014 House Introduced in House
Type of Action: Introduction and Referral