There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Fight Russian Energy Exploitation (FREE) Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To authorize natural gas exports to certain foreign countries, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
03/05/2014Introduced in House

All Actions (5)

Date
04/02/2014Referred to the Subcommittee on Terrorism, Nonproliferation, and Trade.
Action By: Committee on Foreign Affairs
03/07/2014Referred to the Subcommittee on Energy and Power.
Action By: Committee on Energy and Commerce
03/05/2014Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committee on Foreign Affairs, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
03/05/2014Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committee on Foreign Affairs, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
03/05/2014Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (5)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Farenthold, Blake [R-TX-27] 03/12/2014
Rep. Stockman, Steve [R-TX-36] 03/24/2014
Rep. Perry, Scott [R-PA-4] 03/24/2014
Rep. Cook, Paul [R-CA-8] 03/26/2014
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 05/06/2014

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Energy and Commerce03/05/2014 Referred to
House Energy and Commerce Subcommittee on Energy and Power03/07/2014 Referred to
House Foreign Affairs03/05/2014 Referred to
House Foreign Affairs Subcommittee on Terrorism, Nonproliferation, and Trade04/02/2014 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.4155. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (03/05/2014)

Fight Russian Energy Exploitation (FREE) Act - Amends the Natural Gas Act to deem consistent with the public interest an expedited application and approval process for the importation or exportation of natural gas to either the member states of the European Union, or to the former Soviet states of Ukraine, Georgia, Armenia, Azerbaijan, Belarus, Kazakhstan, Kyrgyzstan, Moldova, Tajikistan, Turkmenistan, and Uzbekistan.

Directs the Secretary of State to report to Congress on: (1) how the economic policies of foreign countries with natural gas resources and reserves relate to the development and production of their natural gas resources and reserves, as well as the extent and status of their natural gas resources and reserves; (2) the potential of such countries to export their natural gas production to the global market, including the impact of such exports upon the global market; and (3) U.S. actions to foster natural gas exports to foreign countries having an interest in importing natural gas from the United States.