Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4]* 03/06/2014
Rep. Graves, Tom [R-GA-14]* 03/06/2014
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3]* 03/06/2014
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2]* 03/06/2014
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2]* 03/06/2014
Rep. Farenthold, Blake [R-TX-27] 03/11/2014
Rep. Davis, Rodney [R-IL-13] 03/11/2014
Rep. Williams, Roger [R-TX-25] 03/11/2014
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 03/11/2014
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-8] 03/11/2014
Rep. Meehan, Patrick [R-PA-7] 03/11/2014
Rep. Southerland, Steve II [R-FL-2] 03/11/2014
Rep. Ribble, Reid J. [R-WI-8] 03/11/2014
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3] 03/11/2014
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2] 03/11/2014
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 03/11/2014
Rep. Enyart, William L. [D-IL-12] 03/26/2014
Rep. Renacci, James B. [R-OH-16] 03/26/2014
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 03/26/2014
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 03/26/2014
Rep. Titus, Dina [D-NV-1] 03/26/2014
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 03/26/2014
Rep. Veasey, Marc A. [D-TX-33] 04/02/2014
Rep. Bustos, Cheri [D-IL-17] 04/02/2014
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3] 04/08/2014
Rep. Rice, Tom [R-SC-7] 04/08/2014
Rep. Sanford, Mark [R-SC-1] 04/08/2014
Rep. Barletta, Lou [R-PA-11] 04/08/2014
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 04/08/2014
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 04/30/2014
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 04/30/2014
Rep. Garcia, Joe [D-FL-26] 04/30/2014
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-20] 05/07/2014
Rep. Schrader, Kurt [D-OR-5] 05/22/2014
Rep. Wilson, Frederica S. [D-FL-24] 05/22/2014
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 06/17/2014
Rep. Frankel, Lois [D-FL-22] 07/15/2014
Rep. Wagner, Ann [R-MO-2] 07/15/2014
Rep. Bentivolio, Kerry L. [R-MI-11] 07/16/2014
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1] 07/16/2014
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3] 07/16/2014
Rep. Olson, Pete [R-TX-22] 07/16/2014
Rep. Mullin, Markwayne [R-OK-2] 07/17/2014
Rep. Bachmann, Michele [R-MN-6] 07/17/2014
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10] 07/17/2014
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2] 07/18/2014
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7] 07/22/2014
Rep. Hensarling, Jeb [R-TX-5] 07/22/2014
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [R-TX-4] 07/22/2014
Rep. Gibbs, Bob [R-OH-7] 07/23/2014