Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Jordan, Jim [R-OH-4]* 03/06/2014
Rep. Hensarling, Jeb [R-TX-5]* 03/06/2014
Rep. Mulvaney, Mick [R-SC-5]* 03/06/2014
Rep. Meadows, Mark [R-NC-11]* 03/06/2014
Rep. Rice, Tom [R-SC-7]* 03/06/2014
Rep. Stutzman, Marlin A. [R-IN-3]* 03/06/2014
Rep. Yoho, Ted S. [R-FL-3]* 03/06/2014
Rep. Bachmann, Michele [R-MN-6]* 03/06/2014
Rep. Fleming, John [R-LA-4]* 03/06/2014
Rep. Graves, Tom [R-GA-14]* 03/06/2014
Rep. Gowdy, Trey [R-SC-4]* 03/06/2014
Rep. Lummis, Cynthia M. [R-WY-At Large]* 03/06/2014
Rep. Black, Diane [R-TN-6]* 03/06/2014
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7]* 03/06/2014
Rep. Chaffetz, Jason [R-UT-3]* 03/06/2014
Rep. Kelly, Mike [R-PA-3]* 03/06/2014
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5]* 03/06/2014
Rep. Lance, Leonard [R-NJ-7]* 03/06/2014
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18]* 03/06/2014
Rep. McHenry, Patrick T. [R-NC-10]* 03/06/2014
Rep. Noem, Kristi L. [R-SD-At Large]* 03/06/2014
Rep. Ribble, Reid J. [R-WI-8]* 03/06/2014
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1]* 03/06/2014
Rep. Rooney, Thomas J. [R-FL-17]* 03/06/2014
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12]* 03/06/2014
Rep. Walberg, Tim [R-MI-7]* 03/06/2014
Rep. Webster, Daniel [R-FL-10]* 03/06/2014
Rep. Southerland, Steve II [R-FL-2]* 03/06/2014
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-27]* 03/06/2014
Rep. Harris, Andy [R-MD-1]* 03/06/2014
Rep. Herrera Beutler, Jaime [R-WA-3]* 03/06/2014
Rep. Messer, Luke [R-IN-6]* 03/06/2014
Rep. Duncan, Jeff [R-SC-3]* 03/06/2014
Rep. Davis, Rodney [R-IL-13]* 03/06/2014
Rep. Byrne, Bradley [R-AL-1]* 03/06/2014
Rep. Jenkins, Lynn [R-KS-2]* 03/06/2014
Rep. Luetkemeyer, Blaine [R-MO-3] 03/14/2014
Rep. Gosar, Paul A. [R-AZ-4] 03/25/2014
Rep. Huelskamp, Tim [R-KS-1] 03/25/2014
Rep. Williams, Roger [R-TX-25] 03/25/2014
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10] 03/25/2014
Rep. Long, Billy [R-MO-7] 03/25/2014
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5] 03/26/2014
Rep. McClintock, Tom [R-CA-4] 03/27/2014
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26] 04/03/2014
Rep. Griffin, Tim [R-AR-2] 04/03/2014
Rep. Joyce, David P. [R-OH-14] 04/03/2014
Rep. Bentivolio, Kerry L. [R-MI-11] 04/07/2014
Rep. Johnson, Bill [R-OH-6] 04/28/2014
Rep. Hultgren, Randy [R-IL-14] 05/01/2014
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 05/01/2014
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-2] 05/01/2014
Rep. LaMalfa, Doug [R-CA-1] 05/01/2014
Rep. Olson, Pete [R-TX-22] 05/01/2014
Rep. Weber, Randy K. Sr. [R-TX-14] 05/01/2014
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1] 05/07/2014
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2] 05/07/2014
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 05/07/2014
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21] 05/07/2014
Rep. Turner, Michael R. [R-OH-10] 05/07/2014
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11] 05/08/2014
Rep. Schweikert, David [R-AZ-6] 05/09/2014
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1] 05/09/2014
Rep. Crenshaw, Ander [R-FL-4] 05/09/2014
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 05/09/2014
Rep. Jolly, David [R-FL-13] 05/19/2014
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 05/19/2014
Rep. Hartzler, Vicky [R-MO-4] 05/19/2014
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 05/19/2014
Rep. Schock, Aaron [R-IL-18] 05/20/2014
Rep. Rokita, Todd [R-IN-4] 05/20/2014
Rep. Meehan, Patrick [R-PA-7] 05/21/2014
Rep. Amodei, Mark E. [R-NV-2] 05/23/2014
Rep. Bridenstine, Jim [R-OK-1] 05/23/2014
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6] 05/29/2014
Rep. Smith, Jason T. [R-MO-8] 05/29/2014
Rep. Tipton, Scott R. [R-CO-3] 05/29/2014
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 05/29/2014
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 05/30/2014
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25] 05/30/2014
Rep. Bucshon, Larry [R-IN-8] 07/15/2014
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2] 07/17/2014
Rep. Ross, Dennis A. [R-FL-15] 07/22/2014
Rep. Reed, Tom [R-NY-23] 07/25/2014
Rep. Boustany, Charles W., Jr. [R-LA-3] 07/25/2014
Rep. Thompson, Glenn [R-PA-5] 07/28/2014
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 07/28/2014
Rep. Marino, Tom [R-PA-10] 07/28/2014
Rep. Duffy, Sean P. [R-WI-7] 07/28/2014
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-42] 07/29/2014
Rep. Guthrie, Brett [R-KY-2] 07/30/2014
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-31] 07/30/2014
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-5] 07/31/2014
Rep. Valadao, David G. [R-CA-21] 07/31/2014
Rep. Stewart, Chris [R-UT-2] 07/31/2014
Rep. Young, Todd C. [R-IN-9] 08/01/2014
Rep. Fitzpatrick, Michael G. [R-PA-8] 08/01/2014
Rep. Fortenberry, Jeff [R-NE-1] 09/09/2014
Rep. Stivers, Steve [R-OH-15] 09/15/2014
Rep. Bilirakis, Gus M. [R-FL-12] 09/16/2014
Rep. Hudson, Richard [R-NC-8] 09/16/2014
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11] 09/18/2014
Rep. Walorski, Jackie [R-IN-2] 12/02/2014