Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Bass, Karen [D-CA-37]* 03/06/2014
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7]* 03/06/2014
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7]* 03/06/2014
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5]* 03/06/2014
Rep. Keating, William R. [D-MA-9]* 03/06/2014
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-13]* 03/06/2014
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-8]* 03/06/2014
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2]* 03/06/2014
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-13]* 03/06/2014
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-13]* 03/06/2014
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13]* 03/06/2014
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-15]* 03/06/2014
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1]* 03/06/2014
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6]* 03/06/2014
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-20]* 03/06/2014
Rep. Wilson, Frederica S. [D-FL-24]* 03/06/2014
Rep. Foster, Bill [D-IL-11]* 03/06/2014
Rep. Lujan, Ben Ray [D-NM-3]* 03/06/2014
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 03/24/2014
Rep. O'Rourke, Beto [D-TX-16] 03/24/2014
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 04/29/2014
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 04/29/2014
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-13] 04/29/2014
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 04/29/2014
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 04/29/2014
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2] 04/29/2014
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-40] 04/29/2014
Rep. Ruiz, Raul [D-CA-36] 05/06/2014
Rep. Kuster, Ann M. [D-NH-2] 05/06/2014
Rep. Beatty, Joyce [D-OH-3] 05/06/2014
Rep. Clark, Katherine M. [D-MA-5] 05/06/2014
Rep. Carney, John C., Jr. [D-DE-At Large] 05/29/2014
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-17] 05/29/2014
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 06/18/2014
Rep. Maloney, Sean Patrick [D-NY-18] 07/10/2014
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 07/24/2014
Rep. Cartwright, Matt [D-PA-17] 09/16/2014
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1] 11/12/2014
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-7] 12/09/2014