Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Heck, Joseph J. [R-NV-3]* 03/11/2014
Rep. Joyce, David P. [R-OH-14]* 03/11/2014
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-13]* 03/11/2014
Rep. Fitzpatrick, Michael G. [R-PA-8]* 03/11/2014
Rep. Turner, Michael R. [R-OH-10]* 03/11/2014
Rep. Kelly, Mike [R-PA-3]* 03/11/2014
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2]* 03/11/2014
Rep. Stivers, Steve [R-OH-15]* 03/11/2014
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12]* 03/11/2014
Rep. LaMalfa, Doug [R-CA-1]* 03/11/2014
Rep. Perry, Scott [R-PA-4]* 03/11/2014
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3]* 03/11/2014
Rep. Gibbs, Bob [R-OH-7]* 03/11/2014
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1]* 03/11/2014
Rep. Meehan, Patrick [R-PA-7]* 03/11/2014
Rep. Johnson, Bill [R-OH-6]* 03/11/2014
Rep. Carney, John C., Jr. [D-DE-At Large]* 03/11/2014
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4]* 03/11/2014
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-16]* 03/11/2014
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9]* 03/11/2014
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13]* 03/11/2014
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30]* 03/11/2014
Rep. Davis, Rodney [R-IL-13] 03/12/2014
Rep. Barletta, Lou [R-PA-11] 03/12/2014
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 03/12/2014
Rep. Griffin, Tim [R-AR-2] 03/12/2014
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 03/13/2014
Rep. Boustany, Charles W., Jr. [R-LA-3] 03/13/2014
Rep. Bucshon, Larry [R-IN-8] 03/13/2014
Rep. Barber, Ron [D-AZ-2] 03/13/2014
Rep. Reed, Tom [R-NY-23] 03/13/2014
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5] 03/13/2014
Rep. Wenstrup, Brad R. [R-OH-2] 03/13/2014
Rep. Reichert, David G. [R-WA-8] 03/14/2014
Rep. Young, Todd C. [R-IN-9] 03/24/2014
Rep. Delaney, John K. [D-MD-6] 03/24/2014
Rep. Beatty, Joyce [D-OH-3] 03/24/2014
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 03/24/2014
Rep. Paulsen, Erik [R-MN-3] 03/25/2014
Rep. Veasey, Marc A. [D-TX-33] 03/28/2014
Rep. Bachmann, Michele [R-MN-6] 03/28/2014
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-2] 03/28/2014
Rep. Kilmer, Derek [D-WA-6] 04/03/2014
Rep. Negrete McLeod, Gloria [D-CA-35] 04/08/2014
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-28] 04/09/2014
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 04/09/2014
Rep. Benishek, Dan [R-MI-1] 04/28/2014
Rep. Shuster, Bill [R-PA-9] 04/28/2014
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-13] 04/28/2014
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 04/28/2014
Rep. Valadao, David G. [R-CA-21] 04/28/2014
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 04/28/2014
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-13] 04/28/2014
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-9] 04/30/2014
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 04/30/2014
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10] 04/30/2014
Rep. McKinley, David B. [R-WV-1] 04/30/2014
Rep. Lowenthal, Alan S. [D-CA-47] 05/06/2014
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5] 05/06/2014
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-5] 05/06/2014
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 05/09/2014
Rep. Schock, Aaron [R-IL-18] 05/09/2014
Rep. Costa, Jim [D-CA-16] 05/09/2014
Rep. Black, Diane [R-TN-6] 05/09/2014
Rep. Quigley, Mike [D-IL-5] 05/19/2014
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-15] 05/19/2014
Rep. Meng, Grace [D-NY-6] 05/19/2014
Rep. Hanna, Richard L. [R-NY-22] 05/19/2014
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-3] 05/19/2014
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-10] 05/29/2014
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-12] 05/29/2014
Rep. Maffei, Daniel B. [D-NY-24] 05/29/2014
Rep. Brownley, Julia [D-CA-26] 05/29/2014
Rep. Gibson, Christopher P. [R-NY-19] 06/09/2014
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-40] 06/09/2014
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-7] 06/09/2014
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-8] 06/09/2014
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-5] 06/09/2014
Rep. Vargas, Juan [D-CA-51] 06/09/2014
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 06/11/2014
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-20] 06/17/2014
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-26] 06/17/2014
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 06/19/2014
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26] 06/19/2014
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 06/19/2014
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 06/23/2014
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 06/23/2014
Rep. Farenthold, Blake [R-TX-27] 06/23/2014
Rep. Grimm, Michael G. [R-NY-11] 06/23/2014
Rep. Scott, Austin [R-GA-8] 06/26/2014
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-17] 07/08/2014
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 07/08/2014
Rep. Ross, Dennis A. [R-FL-15] 07/22/2014
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 07/22/2014
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10] 07/22/2014
Rep. Lance, Leonard [R-NJ-7] 07/24/2014
Rep. Maloney, Sean Patrick [D-NY-18] 07/25/2014
Rep. Gallego, Pete P. [D-TX-23] 07/29/2014
Rep. Cartwright, Matt [D-PA-17] 07/29/2014
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-8] 07/31/2014
Rep. Tipton, Scott R. [R-CO-3] 07/31/2014
Rep. Roskam, Peter J. [R-IL-6] 09/09/2014
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1] 09/09/2014
Rep. Ribble, Reid J. [R-WI-8] 09/17/2014
Rep. Salmon, Matt [R-AZ-5] 09/17/2014
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-13] 11/14/2014
Rep. Ruiz, Raul [D-CA-36] 12/03/2014