Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1]* 03/11/2014
Rep. Young, Todd C. [R-IN-9]* 03/11/2014
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1] 03/24/2014
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-5] 03/26/2014
Rep. Schock, Aaron [R-IL-18] 04/01/2014
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 04/02/2014
Rep. Fudge, Marcia L. [D-OH-11] 04/02/2014
Rep. Griffith, H. Morgan [R-VA-9] 04/04/2014
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1] 04/28/2014
Rep. Jeffries, Hakeem S. [D-NY-8] 04/28/2014
Rep. Lujan Grisham, Michelle [D-NM-1] 04/28/2014
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 04/28/2014
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 04/28/2014
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 04/28/2014
Rep. Harper, Gregg [R-MS-3] 04/28/2014
Rep. Enyart, William L. [D-IL-12] 04/30/2014
Rep. Beatty, Joyce [D-OH-3] 05/01/2014
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 05/06/2014
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 05/08/2014
Rep. Owens, William L. [D-NY-21] 05/09/2014
Rep. Schneider, Bradley S. [D-IL-10] 05/09/2014
Rep. Kelly, Robin L. [D-IL-2] 05/09/2014
Rep. Bustos, Cheri [D-IL-17] 05/19/2014
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 05/19/2014
Rep. Johnson, Bill [R-OH-6] 05/19/2014
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2] 05/19/2014
Rep. Lujan, Ben Ray [D-NM-3] 05/19/2014
Rep. Duckworth, Tammy [D-IL-8] 05/19/2014
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-17] 05/19/2014
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 05/20/2014
Rep. Griffin, Tim [R-AR-2] 05/20/2014
Rep. Collins, Doug [R-GA-9] 05/20/2014
Rep. Rooney, Thomas J. [R-FL-17] 05/22/2014
Rep. Coffman, Mike [R-CO-6] 05/22/2014
Rep. Bass, Karen [D-CA-37] 05/28/2014
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1] 05/28/2014
Rep. Olson, Pete [R-TX-22] 05/29/2014
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 05/29/2014
Rep. Shuster, Bill [R-PA-9] 05/29/2014
Rep. Pocan, Mark [D-WI-2] 06/09/2014
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 06/09/2014
Rep. Perry, Scott [R-PA-4] 06/09/2014
Rep. Nunes, Devin [R-CA-22] 06/09/2014
Rep. Wilson, Frederica S. [D-FL-24] 06/09/2014
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10] 06/10/2014
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8] 06/11/2014
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 06/11/2014
Rep. McAllister, Vance M. [R-LA-5] 06/17/2014
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 06/17/2014
Rep. Meadows, Mark [R-NC-11] 06/17/2014
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 06/17/2014
Rep. Kinzinger, Adam [R-IL-16] 06/17/2014
Rep. Jolly, David [R-FL-13] 06/18/2014
Rep. Luetkemeyer, Blaine [R-MO-3] 06/18/2014
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 06/19/2014
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3] 06/19/2014
Rep. Takano, Mark [D-CA-41] 06/23/2014
Rep. Garcia, Joe [D-FL-26] 06/23/2014
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 06/23/2014
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 06/24/2014
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2] 06/24/2014
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-32] 06/25/2014
Rep. Brooks, Susan W. [R-IN-5] 06/26/2014
Rep. Kirkpatrick, Ann [D-AZ-1] 07/08/2014
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 07/08/2014
Rep. Bera, Ami [D-CA-7] 07/09/2014
Rep. Pearce, Stevan [R-NM-2] 07/10/2014
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 07/14/2014
Rep. Stewart, Chris [R-UT-2] 07/14/2014
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 07/17/2014
Rep. Paulsen, Erik [R-MN-3] 07/17/2014
Rep. Thornberry, Mac [R-TX-13] 07/22/2014
Rep. Graves, Sam [R-MO-6] 07/22/2014
Rep. Jenkins, Lynn [R-KS-2] 07/22/2014
Rep. Cuellar, Henry [D-TX-28] 07/22/2014
Rep. Barletta, Lou [R-PA-11] 07/22/2014
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 07/22/2014
Rep. Bentivolio, Kerry L. [R-MI-11] 07/23/2014
Rep. Hunter, Duncan D. [R-CA-50] 07/24/2014
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 07/24/2014
Rep. Pierluisi, Pedro R. [D-PR-At Large] 07/24/2014
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 07/24/2014
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-6] 07/25/2014
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2] 07/29/2014
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-13] 07/29/2014
Rep. Nolan, Richard M. [D-MN-8] 07/29/2014
Rep. Long, Billy [R-MO-7] 07/29/2014
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-28] 07/29/2014
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [R-TX-4] 07/30/2014
Rep. Davis, Rodney [R-IL-13] 07/30/2014
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 07/31/2014
Rep. Reed, Tom [R-NY-23] 07/31/2014
Rep. Barr, Andy [R-KY-6] 08/01/2014
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13] 08/01/2014
Rep. Murphy, Patrick [D-FL-18] 09/08/2014
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 09/08/2014
Rep. Ellmers, Renee L. [R-NC-2] 09/08/2014
Rep. Massie, Thomas [R-KY-4] 09/08/2014
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1] 09/08/2014
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 09/08/2014
Rep. Joyce, David P. [R-OH-14] 09/09/2014
Rep. Noem, Kristi L. [R-SD-At Large] 09/09/2014
Rep. Ross, Dennis A. [R-FL-15] 09/10/2014
Rep. Southerland, Steve II [R-FL-2] 09/11/2014
Rep. Dent, Charles W. [R-PA-15] 09/11/2014
Rep. Stivers, Steve [R-OH-15] 09/15/2014
Rep. Barber, Ron [D-AZ-2] 09/15/2014
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-20] 09/15/2014
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-20] 09/16/2014
Rep. Reichert, David G. [R-WA-8] 09/16/2014
Rep. Lowenthal, Alan S. [D-CA-47] 09/17/2014
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 09/17/2014
Rep. Palazzo, Steven M. [R-MS-4] 09/17/2014
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1] 09/18/2014
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-3] 09/18/2014
Rep. Peters, Gary C. [D-MI-14] 09/18/2014
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-13] 11/12/2014
Rep. Yarmuth, John A. [D-KY-3] 11/12/2014
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-19] 11/12/2014
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-27] 11/12/2014
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 11/12/2014
Rep. O'Rourke, Beto [D-TX-16] 11/12/2014
Rep. Meng, Grace [D-NY-6] 12/01/2014