Refine your search

18 results for All Actions
Date Chamber All Actions
05/16/2014 Became Public Law No: 113-103.
Type of Action: To President
05/16/2014 Signed by President.
Type of Action: To President
05/07/2014 House Presented to President.
05/07/2014 Senate Message on Senate action sent to the House.
Type of Action: Floor Consideration
05/06/2014 Senate Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S2740)
Type of Action: Floor Consideration
04/29/2014 Senate Received in the Senate, read twice.
Type of Action: Introduction and Referral
04/28/2014-6:58pm House On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 367 - 16 (Roll no. 178). (text: CR H3207)
Type of Action: Floor Consideration
04/28/2014-6:31pm House Considered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H3219-3220)
Type of Action: Floor Consideration
04/28/2014-4:52pm House At the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed.
Type of Action: Floor Consideration
04/28/2014-4:32pm House DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 4192.
Type of Action: Floor Consideration
04/28/2014-4:32pm House Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H3207-3209)
Type of Action: Floor Consideration
04/28/2014-4:32pm House Mr. Issa moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
Type of Action: Floor Consideration
04/28/2014 House Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 308.
Type of Action: Calendars
04/28/2014 House Reported by the Committee on Oversight and Government Reform. H. Rept. 113-418.
Type of Action: Committee Consideration
Action By: House Oversight and Government Reform
03/12/2014 House Ordered to be Reported by Voice Vote.
Type of Action: Committee Consideration
Action By: House Oversight and Government Reform
03/12/2014 House Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Type of Action: Committee Consideration
Action By: House Oversight and Government Reform
03/11/2014 House Referred to the House Committee on Oversight and Government Reform.
Type of Action: Introduction and Referral
03/11/2014 House Introduced in House
Type of Action: Introduction and Referral