Refine your search

27 results for All Actions
Date Chamber All Actions
11/26/2014 Became Public Law No: 113-188.
11/26/2014 Signed by President.
11/17/2014 House Presented to President.
Action By: House of Representatives
11/12/2014-6:55pm House Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
Type of Action: Resolving Differences
Action By: House of Representatives
11/12/2014-6:55pm House On motion that the House suspend the rules and agree to the Senate amendment Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 382 - 0 (Roll no. 516). (text as House agreed to Senate amendment: CR H7907-7909)
Type of Action: Resolving Differences
Action By: House of Representatives
11/12/2014-6:55pm House Considered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H7915-7916)
Type of Action: Floor Consideration
Action By: House of Representatives
11/12/2014-4:11pm House At the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed.
Type of Action: Resolving Differences
Action By: House of Representatives
11/12/2014-4:00pm House DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on the Senate amendment to H.R. 4194.
Type of Action: Floor Consideration
Action By: House of Representatives
11/12/2014-4:00pm House Mr. Issa moved that the House suspend the rules and agree to the Senate amendment. (consideration: CR H7907-7910)
Type of Action: Resolving Differences
Action By: House of Representatives
09/17/2014 Senate Message on Senate action sent to the House.
Type of Action: Floor Consideration
Action By: Senate
09/16/2014 Senate Passed Senate with an amendment by Unanimous Consent.
Type of Action: Floor Consideration
Action By: Senate
09/16/2014 Senate The committee substitute as amended agreed to by Unanimous Consent. (text: CR S5644-5646)
Type of Action: Floor Consideration
Action By: Senate
09/16/2014 Senate Measure laid before Senate by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR S5644-5647)
Type of Action: Floor Consideration
Action By: Senate
07/31/2014 Senate Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 505.
Type of Action: Calendars
Action By: Senate
07/31/2014 Senate Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Reported by Senator Carper with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. With written report No. 113-232.
Type of Action: Committee Consideration
Action By: Senate Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs
06/25/2014 Senate Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Ordered to be reported with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably.
Type of Action: Committee Consideration
Action By: Senate Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs
04/29/2014 Senate Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
Type of Action: Introduction and Referral
Action By: Senate
04/28/2014-5:00pm House On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H3209-3212)
Type of Action: Floor Consideration
Action By: House of Representatives
04/28/2014-4:53pm House DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 4194.
Type of Action: Floor Consideration
Action By: House of Representatives
04/28/2014-4:53pm House Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H3209-3212)
Type of Action: Floor Consideration
Action By: House of Representatives
04/28/2014-4:53pm House Mr. Issa moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
Type of Action: Floor Consideration
Action By: House of Representatives
04/28/2014 House Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 309.
Type of Action: Calendars
Action By: House of Representatives
04/28/2014 House Reported by the Committee on Oversight and Government Reform. H. Rept. 113-419.
Type of Action: Committee Consideration
Action By: House Oversight and Government Reform
03/12/2014 House Ordered to be Reported by Voice Vote.
Type of Action: Committee Consideration
Action By: House Oversight and Government Reform
03/12/2014 House Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Type of Action: Committee Consideration
Action By: House Oversight and Government Reform
03/11/2014 House Referred to the House Committee on Oversight and Government Reform.
Type of Action: Introduction and Referral
Action By: House of Representatives
03/11/2014 House Introduced in House
Type of Action: Introduction and Referral
Action By: House of Representatives