Refine your search

Showing 15 of 15 total for All Actions.
Date Chamber All Actions
07/15/2014 Senate Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
Type of Action: Introduction and Referral
Action By: Senate
07/14/2014-7:02pm House Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
Type of Action: Floor Consideration
Action By: House of Representatives
07/14/2014-7:02pm House On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 386 - 0 (Roll no. 405). (text: CR H6164-6165)
Type of Action: Floor Consideration
Action By: House of Representatives
07/14/2014-6:31pm House Considered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H6167-6168)
Type of Action: Floor Consideration
Action By: House of Representatives
07/14/2014-5:44pm House At the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed.
Type of Action: Floor Consideration
Action By: House of Representatives
07/14/2014-5:37pm House DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 4195.
Type of Action: Floor Consideration
Action By: House of Representatives
07/14/2014-5:37pm House Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H6164-6166)
Type of Action: Floor Consideration
Action By: House of Representatives
07/14/2014-5:37pm House Mr. Gosar moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
Type of Action: Floor Consideration
Action By: House of Representatives
07/03/2014 House Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 387.
Type of Action: Calendars
Action By: House of Representatives
07/03/2014 House Reported by the Committee on Oversight and Government Reform. H. Rept. 113-515.
Type of Action: Committee Consideration
Action By: House Oversight and Government Reform
03/12/2014 House Ordered to be Reported by Voice Vote.
Type of Action: Committee Consideration
Action By: House Oversight and Government Reform
03/12/2014 House Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Type of Action: Committee Consideration
Action By: House Oversight and Government Reform
03/11/2014 House Referred to the House Committee on Oversight and Government Reform.
Type of Action: Introduction and Referral
Action By: House of Representatives
03/11/2014 House Referred to the House Committee on Oversight and Government Reform.
Type of Action: Introduction and Referral
Action By: House of Representatives
03/11/2014 House Introduced in House
Type of Action: Introduction and Referral
Action By: House of Representatives