Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Paulsen, Erik [R-MN-3] 03/27/2014
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-12] 03/28/2014
Rep. McHenry, Patrick T. [R-NC-10] 04/04/2014
Rep. Himes, James A. [D-CT-4] 05/06/2014
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 05/06/2014
Rep. Murphy, Patrick [D-FL-18] 05/07/2014
Rep. Rothfus, Keith J. [R-PA-12] 05/15/2014
Rep. Foster, Bill [D-IL-11] 05/15/2014
Rep. Schneider, Bradley S. [D-IL-10] 05/21/2014