Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Ross, Dennis A. [R-FL-15]* 03/11/2014
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-5]* 03/11/2014
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4]* 03/11/2014
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-10] 03/24/2014
Rep. Lowenthal, Alan S. [D-CA-47] 03/25/2014
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-8] 03/25/2014
Rep. Foster, Bill [D-IL-11] 05/21/2014
Rep. Lujan, Ben Ray [D-NM-3] 05/21/2014
Rep. Nolan, Richard M. [D-MN-8] 07/17/2014
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 07/22/2014