Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-2]* 01/25/2013
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-9]* 01/25/2013
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-13]* 01/25/2013
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 03/04/2013
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 03/07/2013
Rep. Benishek, Dan [R-MI-1] 04/10/2013
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 04/11/2013
Rep. Hanna, Richard L. [R-NY-22] 02/25/2014
Rep. Enyart, William L. [D-IL-12] 06/30/2014
Rep. DelBene, Suzan K. [D-WA-1] 07/09/2014