Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Peters, Gary C. [D-MI-14]* 03/12/2014
Rep. Walberg, Tim [R-MI-7]* 03/12/2014
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 03/13/2014
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-3] 03/14/2014
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 03/14/2014
Rep. Grimm, Michael G. [R-NY-11] 03/24/2014
Rep. Hultgren, Randy [R-IL-14] 04/08/2014
Rep. Joyce, David P. [R-OH-14] 04/28/2014
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 05/07/2014
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-42] 05/07/2014
Rep. Kuster, Ann M. [D-NH-2] 05/22/2014
Rep. Pompeo, Mike [R-KS-4] 05/30/2014
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 07/09/2014