Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7]* 03/12/2014
Rep. Matheson, Jim [D-UT-4]* 03/12/2014
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-3] 04/02/2014
Rep. Black, Diane [R-TN-6] 04/02/2014
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3] 04/02/2014
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1] 04/02/2014
Rep. Fincher, Stephen Lee [R-TN-8] 04/02/2014
Rep. Mulvaney, Mick [R-SC-5] 04/07/2014
Rep. Wagner, Ann [R-MO-2] 04/28/2014
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 04/30/2014
Rep. Womack, Steve [R-AR-3] 05/07/2014
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 05/28/2014
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-5] 06/12/2014
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1] 08/01/2014