There are 4 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (7)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

SAVE Act of 2014
Stop Advertising Victims of Exploitation Act of 2014

Short Titles as Reported to House

SAVE Act of 2014
Stop Advertising Victims of Exploitation Act of 2014

Short Titles as Introduced

SAVE Act of 2014
Stop Advertising Victims of Exploitation Act of 2014

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend title 18, United States Code, to provide a penalty for knowingly selling advertising that offers certain commercial sex acts.


Actions Overview (3)

Date
05/20/2014Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 392 - 19 (Roll no. 222).(text: CR H4515)
05/15/2014Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Judiciary. H. Rept. 113-451.
03/13/2014Introduced in House

All Actions (15)

Date Chamber
05/21/2014SenateReceived in the Senate.
05/20/2014-6:36pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 392 - 19 (Roll no. 222). (text: CR H4515)
05/20/2014-6:27pmHouseConsidered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H4535)
05/20/2014-4:51pmHouseAt the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed.
05/20/2014-4:05pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 4225.
05/20/2014-4:05pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H4515-4522)
05/20/2014-4:05pmHouseMr. Goodlatte moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
05/15/2014HousePlaced on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 333.
05/15/2014HouseReported (Amended) by the Committee on Judiciary. H. Rept. 113-451.
04/30/2014HouseOrdered to be Reported (Amended) by the Yeas and Nays: 24 - 3.
04/30/2014HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
04/29/2014HouseSubcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, Homeland Security, and Investigations Discharged.
04/16/2014HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, Homeland Security, and Investigations.
Action By: Committee on the Judiciary
03/13/2014HouseReferred to the House Committee on the Judiciary.
03/13/2014HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (92)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Noem, Kristi L. [R-SD-At Large] 03/14/2014
Rep. Ellmers, Renee L. [R-NC-2] 03/14/2014
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 03/14/2014
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 03/24/2014
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10] 03/24/2014
Rep. Davis, Rodney [R-IL-13] 03/24/2014
Rep. Paulsen, Erik [R-MN-3] 03/24/2014
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-8] 03/24/2014
Rep. Long, Billy [R-MO-7] 03/26/2014
Rep. Coffman, Mike [R-CO-6] 03/26/2014
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-5] 03/26/2014
Rep. Southerland, Steve II [R-FL-2] 03/26/2014
Rep. Lankford, James [R-OK-5] 03/26/2014
Rep. Cotton, Tom [R-AR-4] 03/27/2014
Rep. Lance, Leonard [R-NJ-7] 03/27/2014
Rep. Black, Diane [R-TN-6] 03/27/2014
Rep. Weber, Randy K., Sr. [R-TX-14] 03/27/2014
Rep. Gibson, Christopher P. [R-NY-19] 03/27/2014
Rep. Pittenger, Robert [R-NC-9] 04/01/2014
Rep. Bachmann, Michele [R-MN-6] 04/01/2014
Rep. Roskam, Peter J. [R-IL-6] 04/01/2014
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 04/02/2014
Rep. Bass, Karen [D-CA-37] 04/02/2014
Rep. Stivers, Steve [R-OH-15] 04/02/2014
Rep. Mullin, Markwayne [R-OK-2] 04/03/2014
Rep. Jenkins, Lynn [R-KS-2] 04/03/2014
Rep. Rodgers, Cathy McMorris [R-WA-5] 04/03/2014
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2] 04/03/2014
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10] 04/03/2014
Rep. Hudson, Richard [R-NC-8] 04/03/2014
Rep. Nugent, Richard B. [R-FL-11] 04/03/2014
Rep. Jolly, David [R-FL-13] 04/04/2014
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-15] 04/04/2014
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 04/07/2014
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5] 04/07/2014
Rep. Beatty, Joyce [D-OH-3] 04/07/2014
Rep. Ross, Dennis A. [R-FL-15] 04/07/2014
Rep. Gibbs, Bob [R-OH-7] 04/08/2014
Rep. Hartzler, Vicky [R-MO-4] 04/08/2014
Rep. LaMalfa, Doug [R-CA-1] 04/08/2014
Rep. Boustany, Charles W., Jr. [R-LA-3] 04/09/2014
Rep. Farenthold, Blake [R-TX-27] 04/09/2014
Rep. McHenry, Patrick T. [R-NC-10] 04/09/2014
Rep. Frelinghuysen, Rodney P. [R-NJ-11] 04/09/2014
Rep. Brooks, Susan W. [R-IN-5] 04/09/2014
Rep. Holding, George [R-NC-13] 04/09/2014
Rep. Smith, Jason [R-MO-8] 04/09/2014
Rep. Yoho, Ted S. [R-FL-3] 04/09/2014
Rep. Webster, Daniel [R-FL-10] 04/10/2014
Rep. Lummis, Cynthia M. [R-WY-At Large] 04/10/2014
Rep. Roby, Martha [R-AL-2] 04/10/2014
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2] 04/10/2014
Rep. Reichert, David G. [R-WA-8] 04/10/2014
Rep. Luetkemeyer, Blaine [R-MO-3] 04/10/2014
Rep. Graves, Sam [R-MO-6] 04/10/2014
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 04/10/2014
Rep. Schock, Aaron [R-IL-18] 04/28/2014
Rep. Stewart, Chris [R-UT-2] 04/28/2014
Rep. Rothfus, Keith J. [R-PA-12] 04/28/2014
Rep. Walberg, Tim [R-MI-7] 04/28/2014
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 04/28/2014
Rep. Granger, Kay [R-TX-12] 04/28/2014
Rep. Barr, Andy [R-KY-6] 04/28/2014
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18] 04/28/2014
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 04/28/2014
Rep. Pearce, Stevan [R-NM-2] 04/28/2014
Rep. Herrera Beutler, Jaime [R-WA-3] 04/28/2014
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19] 04/28/2014
Rep. Cramer, Kevin [R-ND-At Large] 04/28/2014
Rep. Walorski, Jackie [R-IN-2] 04/28/2014
Rep. Kuster, Ann M. [D-NH-2] 04/29/2014
Rep. Palazzo, Steven M. [R-MS-4] 04/29/2014
Rep. Kelly, Robin L. [D-IL-2] 04/29/2014
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-3] 04/29/2014
Rep. Joyce, David P. [R-OH-14] 04/29/2014
Rep. Esty, Elizabeth H. [D-CT-5] 04/30/2014
Rep. Bustos, Cheri [D-IL-17] 04/30/2014
Rep. Clark, Katherine M. [D-MA-5] 04/30/2014
Rep. Frankel, Lois [D-FL-22] 04/30/2014
Rep. Titus, Dina [D-NV-1] 04/30/2014
Rep. Kirkpatrick, Ann [D-AZ-1] 04/30/2014
Rep. Sinema, Kyrsten [D-AZ-9] 04/30/2014
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 04/30/2014
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-14] 04/30/2014
Rep. Brownley, Julia [D-CA-26] 04/30/2014
Rep. Meng, Grace [D-NY-6] 04/30/2014
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-12] 04/30/2014
Rep. Barletta, Lou [R-PA-11] 05/01/2014
Rep. Gosar, Paul A. [R-AZ-4] 05/06/2014
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 05/06/2014
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Mario [R-FL-25] 05/07/2014
Rep. Peters, Scott H. [D-CA-52] 05/08/2014

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Judiciary03/13/2014 Referred to
04/30/2014 Markup by
05/15/2014 Reported by H. Rept. 113-451
House Judiciary Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, Homeland Security, and Investigations04/16/2014 Referred to
04/29/2014 Discharged from

No related bill information was received for H.R.4225.


Latest Summary (3)

There are 3 summaries for H.R.4225. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed House amended (05/20/2014)

(This measure has not been amended since it was reported to the House on May 15, 2014. The summary of that version is repeated here.)

Stop Advertising Victims of Exploitation Act of 2014 or the SAVE Act of 2014 - Amends the federal criminal code to prohibit knowingly: (1) advertising commercial sex acts involving a minor or an individual engaged in such an act through force, fraud, or coercion; or (2) benefitting financially or otherwise from such advertising knowing that the individual involved was a minor or victim of force, fraud, or coercion.