Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Noem, Kristi L. [R-SD-At Large] 03/14/2014
Rep. Ellmers, Renee L. [R-NC-2] 03/14/2014
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 03/14/2014
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 03/24/2014
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10] 03/24/2014
Rep. Davis, Rodney [R-IL-13] 03/24/2014
Rep. Paulsen, Erik [R-MN-3] 03/24/2014
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-8] 03/24/2014
Rep. Long, Billy [R-MO-7] 03/26/2014
Rep. Coffman, Mike [R-CO-6] 03/26/2014
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-5] 03/26/2014
Rep. Southerland, Steve II [R-FL-2] 03/26/2014
Rep. Lankford, James [R-OK-5] 03/26/2014
Rep. Cotton, Tom [R-AR-4] 03/27/2014
Rep. Lance, Leonard [R-NJ-7] 03/27/2014
Rep. Black, Diane [R-TN-6] 03/27/2014
Rep. Weber, Randy K. Sr. [R-TX-14] 03/27/2014
Rep. Gibson, Christopher P. [R-NY-19] 03/27/2014
Rep. Pittenger, Robert [R-NC-9] 04/01/2014
Rep. Bachmann, Michele [R-MN-6] 04/01/2014
Rep. Roskam, Peter J. [R-IL-6] 04/01/2014
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 04/02/2014
Rep. Bass, Karen [D-CA-37] 04/02/2014
Rep. Stivers, Steve [R-OH-15] 04/02/2014
Rep. Mullin, Markwayne [R-OK-2] 04/03/2014
Rep. Jenkins, Lynn [R-KS-2] 04/03/2014
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5] 04/03/2014
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2] 04/03/2014
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10] 04/03/2014
Rep. Hudson, Richard [R-NC-8] 04/03/2014
Rep. Nugent, Richard B. [R-FL-11] 04/03/2014
Rep. Jolly, David [R-FL-13] 04/04/2014
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-15] 04/04/2014
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 04/07/2014
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5] 04/07/2014
Rep. Beatty, Joyce [D-OH-3] 04/07/2014
Rep. Ross, Dennis A. [R-FL-15] 04/07/2014
Rep. Gibbs, Bob [R-OH-7] 04/08/2014
Rep. Hartzler, Vicky [R-MO-4] 04/08/2014
Rep. LaMalfa, Doug [R-CA-1] 04/08/2014
Rep. Boustany, Charles W., Jr. [R-LA-3] 04/09/2014
Rep. Farenthold, Blake [R-TX-27] 04/09/2014
Rep. McHenry, Patrick T. [R-NC-10] 04/09/2014
Rep. Frelinghuysen, Rodney P. [R-NJ-11] 04/09/2014
Rep. Brooks, Susan W. [R-IN-5] 04/09/2014
Rep. Holding, George [R-NC-13] 04/09/2014
Rep. Smith, Jason T. [R-MO-8] 04/09/2014
Rep. Yoho, Ted S. [R-FL-3] 04/09/2014
Rep. Webster, Daniel [R-FL-10] 04/10/2014
Rep. Lummis, Cynthia M. [R-WY-At Large] 04/10/2014
Rep. Roby, Martha [R-AL-2] 04/10/2014
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2] 04/10/2014
Rep. Reichert, David G. [R-WA-8] 04/10/2014
Rep. Luetkemeyer, Blaine [R-MO-3] 04/10/2014
Rep. Graves, Sam [R-MO-6] 04/10/2014
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 04/10/2014
Rep. Schock, Aaron [R-IL-18] 04/28/2014
Rep. Stewart, Chris [R-UT-2] 04/28/2014
Rep. Rothfus, Keith J. [R-PA-12] 04/28/2014
Rep. Walberg, Tim [R-MI-7] 04/28/2014
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 04/28/2014
Rep. Granger, Kay [R-TX-12] 04/28/2014
Rep. Barr, Andy [R-KY-6] 04/28/2014
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18] 04/28/2014
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 04/28/2014
Rep. Pearce, Stevan [R-NM-2] 04/28/2014
Rep. Herrera Beutler, Jaime [R-WA-3] 04/28/2014
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19] 04/28/2014
Rep. Cramer, Kevin [R-ND-At Large] 04/28/2014
Rep. Walorski, Jackie [R-IN-2] 04/28/2014
Rep. Kuster, Ann M. [D-NH-2] 04/29/2014
Rep. Palazzo, Steven M. [R-MS-4] 04/29/2014
Rep. Kelly, Robin L. [D-IL-2] 04/29/2014
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-3] 04/29/2014
Rep. Joyce, David P. [R-OH-14] 04/29/2014
Rep. Esty, Elizabeth H. [D-CT-5] 04/30/2014
Rep. Bustos, Cheri [D-IL-17] 04/30/2014
Rep. Clark, Katherine M. [D-MA-5] 04/30/2014
Rep. Frankel, Lois [D-FL-22] 04/30/2014
Rep. Titus, Dina [D-NV-1] 04/30/2014
Rep. Kirkpatrick, Ann [D-AZ-1] 04/30/2014
Rep. Sinema, Kyrsten [D-AZ-9] 04/30/2014
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 04/30/2014
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-14] 04/30/2014
Rep. Brownley, Julia [D-CA-26] 04/30/2014
Rep. Meng, Grace [D-NY-6] 04/30/2014
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-12] 04/30/2014
Rep. Barletta, Lou [R-PA-11] 05/01/2014
Rep. Gosar, Paul A. [R-AZ-4] 05/06/2014
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 05/06/2014
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Mario [R-FL-25] 05/07/2014
Rep. Peters, Scott H. [D-CA-52] 05/08/2014