Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3]* 03/13/2014
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-10]* 03/13/2014
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2]* 03/13/2014
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 03/13/2014
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6]* 03/13/2014
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2]* 03/13/2014
Rep. Swalwell, Eric [D-CA-15]* 03/13/2014
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-17]* 03/13/2014
Rep. Enyart, William L. [D-IL-12]* 03/13/2014
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-13]* 03/13/2014
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-25]* 03/13/2014
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 03/13/2014
Rep. Grayson, Alan [D-FL-9]* 03/13/2014
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4]* 03/13/2014
Rep. Pocan, Mark [D-WI-2]* 03/13/2014
Rep. Sablan, Gregorio Kilili Camacho [D-MP-At Large]* 03/13/2014
Rep. Takano, Mark [D-CA-41]* 03/13/2014
Rep. Clark, Katherine M. [D-MA-5]* 03/13/2014
Rep. Fudge, Marcia L. [D-OH-11]* 03/13/2014
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-3]* 03/13/2014
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4]* 03/13/2014
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3]* 03/13/2014
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12]* 03/13/2014
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 03/13/2014
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 03/18/2014
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-23] 03/18/2014
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-12] 03/18/2014
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 03/21/2014
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-8] 03/24/2014
Rep. Lujan Grisham, Michelle [D-NM-1] 03/25/2014
Rep. Huffman, Jared [D-CA-2] 03/27/2014
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-19] 03/27/2014
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 04/02/2014
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-18] 04/07/2014
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 04/07/2014
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 04/07/2014
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-20] 04/07/2014
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-5] 04/08/2014
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-14] 04/08/2014
Rep. DelBene, Suzan K. [D-WA-1] 04/28/2014
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 04/28/2014
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-13] 04/28/2014
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13] 04/28/2014
Rep. Deutch, Theodore E. [D-FL-21] 04/28/2014
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 04/29/2014
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 05/06/2014
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1] 05/06/2014
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-28] 05/15/2014
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 05/23/2014
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-9] 05/23/2014
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-7] 06/09/2014
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 06/26/2014
Rep. Vargas, Juan [D-CA-51] 06/30/2014
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-5] 06/30/2014
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 06/30/2014
Rep. Payne, Donald M., Jr. [D-NJ-10] 07/03/2014
Rep. Lowenthal, Alan S. [D-CA-47] 07/10/2014
Rep. Perlmutter, Ed [D-CO-7] 07/25/2014
Rep. Cartwright, Matt [D-PA-17] 07/29/2014
Rep. Negrete McLeod, Gloria [D-CA-35] 07/31/2014
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-14] 09/15/2014
Rep. Meng, Grace [D-NY-6] 12/11/2014