Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Gibson, Christopher P. [R-NY-19]* 03/13/2014
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 03/26/2014
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-13] 03/26/2014
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 03/26/2014
Rep. Swalwell, Eric [D-CA-15] 04/04/2014
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-27] 04/08/2014
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2] 05/08/2014
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 05/08/2014