Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13]* 03/13/2014
Rep. Farenthold, Blake [R-TX-27] 03/25/2014
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 03/25/2014
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 03/25/2014
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 03/25/2014
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-17] 04/02/2014
Rep. Enyart, William L. [D-IL-12] 04/02/2014
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 04/02/2014
Rep. Carney, John C., Jr. [D-DE-At Large] 04/02/2014
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11] 04/03/2014
Rep. Walorski, Jackie [R-IN-2] 04/03/2014
Rep. Brooks, Susan W. [R-IN-5] 04/03/2014
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 04/03/2014
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5] 04/09/2014
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-27] 04/09/2014
Rep. O'Rourke, Beto [D-TX-16] 04/09/2014
Rep. Beatty, Joyce [D-OH-3] 04/28/2014
Rep. Griffin, Tim [R-AR-2] 04/28/2014
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 04/28/2014
Rep. Black, Diane [R-TN-6] 04/29/2014
Rep. Visclosky, Peter J. [D-IN-1] 05/08/2014
Rep. Titus, Dina [D-NV-1] 05/08/2014
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-13] 05/15/2014
Rep. Gibbs, Bob [R-OH-7] 06/10/2014
Rep. Takano, Mark [D-CA-41] 06/18/2014
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 06/18/2014
Rep. Young, Todd C. [R-IN-9] 06/18/2014
Rep. Barr, Andy [R-KY-6] 06/23/2014
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 06/24/2014
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 06/24/2014
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-18] 07/08/2014
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-15] 07/08/2014
Rep. Meehan, Patrick [R-PA-7] 07/11/2014
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1] 07/11/2014
Rep. Cramer, Kevin [R-ND-At Large] 07/11/2014
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4] 07/24/2014
Rep. Smith, Jason T. [R-MO-8] 07/24/2014
Rep. Cartwright, Matt [D-PA-17] 07/31/2014
Rep. Tsongas, Niki [D-MA-3] 09/18/2014