Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3]* 01/25/2013
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3]* 01/25/2013
Rep. Long, Billy [R-MO-7]* 01/25/2013
Rep. Hartzler, Vicky [R-MO-4]* 01/25/2013
Rep. Foxx, Virginia [R-NC-5]* 01/25/2013
Rep. Barletta, Lou [R-PA-11]* 01/25/2013
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 02/05/2013
Rep. Collins, Doug [R-GA-9] 01/28/2014
Rep. Perry, Scott [R-PA-4] 02/25/2014
Rep. Brooks, Mo [R-AL-5] 07/08/2014
Rep. Gosar, Paul A. [R-AZ-4] 07/22/2014