Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Lowenthal, Alan S. [D-CA-47]* 03/14/2014
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10]* 03/14/2014
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-46]* 03/14/2014
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-19] 03/24/2014
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2] 03/26/2014
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10] 03/26/2014
Rep. Posey, Bill [R-FL-8] 04/28/2014
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-48] 07/09/2014