Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Horsford, Steven A. [D-NV-4]* 03/14/2014
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11]* 03/14/2014
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-11]* 03/14/2014
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-32]* 03/14/2014
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-3]* 03/14/2014
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8]* 03/14/2014
Rep. Nolan, Richard M. [D-MN-8]* 03/14/2014
Rep. Hahn, Janice [D-CA-44]* 03/14/2014
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-25]* 03/14/2014
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-13]* 03/14/2014
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-20]* 03/14/2014
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-17]* 03/14/2014
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-46]* 03/14/2014
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-18]* 03/14/2014
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-14]* 03/14/2014
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-20]* 03/14/2014
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4]* 03/14/2014
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-20]* 03/14/2014
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2]* 03/14/2014
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1]* 03/14/2014
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 03/14/2014
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30]* 03/14/2014
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-8]* 03/14/2014
Rep. Bonamici, Suzanne [D-OR-1]* 03/14/2014
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4]* 03/14/2014
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9]* 03/14/2014
Rep. Cardenas, Tony [D-CA-29]* 03/14/2014
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9]* 03/14/2014
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1]* 03/14/2014
Rep. Garcia, Joe [D-FL-26]* 03/14/2014
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-1]* 03/14/2014
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1]* 03/14/2014
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5]* 03/14/2014
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6]* 03/14/2014
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2]* 03/14/2014
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 03/14/2014
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14]* 03/14/2014
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-27]* 03/14/2014
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-5]* 03/14/2014
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-13]* 03/14/2014
Rep. Clark, Katherine M. [D-MA-5]* 03/14/2014
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-13]* 03/14/2014
Rep. Wilson, Frederica S. [D-FL-24]* 03/14/2014
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1]* 03/14/2014
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-19]* 03/14/2014
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-5]* 03/14/2014
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7]* 03/14/2014
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-7]* 03/14/2014
Rep. Takano, Mark [D-CA-41]* 03/14/2014
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2]* 03/14/2014
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-40]* 03/14/2014
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29]* 03/14/2014
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1]* 03/14/2014
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3]* 03/14/2014
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 03/24/2014
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 03/24/2014
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-14] 03/26/2014
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1] 03/26/2014
Rep. Enyart, William L. [D-IL-12] 03/26/2014
Rep. Grayson, Alan [D-FL-9] 03/26/2014
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 03/26/2014
Rep. Lowenthal, Alan S. [D-CA-47] 03/26/2014
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 03/26/2014
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 04/10/2014
Rep. Tsongas, Niki [D-MA-3] 04/10/2014
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-26] 07/11/2014