Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2]* 03/14/2014
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30]* 03/14/2014
Rep. McKinley, David B. [R-WV-1] 05/01/2014
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-13] 06/17/2014
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-9] 08/01/2014
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 09/09/2014
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-5] 09/09/2014