Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Kirkpatrick, Ann [D-AZ-1]* 03/14/2014
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2]* 03/14/2014
Rep. Stivers, Steve [R-OH-15] 03/27/2014
Rep. O'Rourke, Beto [D-TX-16] 03/27/2014
Rep. Perlmutter, Ed [D-CO-7] 04/02/2014
Rep. Walorski, Jackie [R-IN-2] 04/07/2014
Rep. Yoder, Kevin [R-KS-3] 04/28/2014
Rep. Clark, Katherine M. [D-MA-5] 05/08/2014