Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-11]* 03/14/2014
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-42]* 03/14/2014
Rep. Peters, Scott H. [D-CA-52]* 03/14/2014
Rep. Vargas, Juan [D-CA-51]* 03/14/2014
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4]* 03/14/2014
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 03/26/2014
Rep. Huffman, Jared [D-CA-2] 05/08/2014
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F. H. [D-AS-At Large] 05/08/2014
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-3] 05/09/2014
Rep. Kirkpatrick, Ann [D-AZ-1] 05/09/2014
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25] 05/28/2014
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-48] 05/28/2014