Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. McCarthy, Kevin [R-CA-23]* 03/18/2014
Rep. Enyart, William L. [D-IL-12] 07/14/2014
Rep. Jolly, David [R-FL-13] 07/23/2014
Rep. Brooks, Susan W. [R-IN-5] 07/23/2014
Rep. Young, Todd C. [R-IN-9] 07/24/2014
Rep. Sinema, Kyrsten [D-AZ-9] 09/15/2014