There are 4 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend the Wild and Scenic Rivers Act to authorize the Secretary of the Interior to maintain or replace certain facilities and structures for commercial recreation services at Smith Gulch in Idaho, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (3)

Date
09/08/2014Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 398 - 1 (Roll no. 483).(text: CR H7270)
07/17/2014Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 113-533.
03/21/2014Introduced in House

All Actions (17)

Date Chamber
09/09/2014SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
09/08/2014-7:17pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
09/08/2014-7:17pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 398 - 1 (Roll no. 483). (text: CR H7270)
09/08/2014-7:04pmHouseConsidered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H7276)
09/08/2014-5:41pmHouseAt the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed.
09/08/2014-5:36pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 4283.
09/08/2014-5:36pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H7270-7271)
09/08/2014-5:36pmHouseMr. Young (AK) moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
07/17/2014HousePlaced on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 399.
07/17/2014HouseReported (Amended) by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 113-533.
06/19/2014HouseOrdered to be Reported (Amended) by Unanimous Consent.
06/19/2014HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
06/19/2014HouseSubcommittee on Public Lands and Environmental Regulation Discharged.
06/10/2014HouseSubcommittee Hearings Held.
Action By: House Natural Resources Subcommittee on Public Lands and Environmental Regulation
03/24/2014HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Public Lands and Environmental Regulation.
Action By: Committee on Natural Resources
03/21/2014HouseReferred to the House Committee on Natural Resources.
03/21/2014HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (0)

No cosponsors.


Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Natural Resources03/21/2014 Referred to
06/19/2014 Markup by
07/17/2014 Reported by H. Rept. 113-533
House Natural Resources Subcommittee on Public Lands and Environmental Regulation03/24/2014 Referred to
06/10/2014 Hearings by
06/19/2014 Discharged from
Senate Energy and Natural Resources09/09/2014 Referred to

No related bill information was received for H.R.4283.


Latest Summary (3)

There are 3 summaries for H.R.4283. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed House amended (09/08/2014)

(This measure has not been amended since it was reported to the House on July 17, 2014. The summary of that version is repeated here.)

Amends the Wild and Scenic Rivers Act to direct the Secretary of the Interior, with respect to the Salmon River in Idaho, to authorize or continue to authorize maintenance or replacement of the facilities and structures listed in this Act for commercial recreation services at Smith Gulch.