Text: H.R.4296 — 113th Congress (2013-2014)All Information (Except Text)

Text available as:

Shown Here:
Reported in House (12/22/2014)

Union Calendar No. 529

113th CONGRESS
2d Session
H. R. 4296

[Report No. 113–698, Part I]


To amend Public Law 94–241 with respect to the Northern Mariana Islands.


IN THE HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES

March 25, 2014

Mr. Sablan introduced the following bill; which was referred to the Committee on Natural Resources, and in addition to the Committee on the Judiciary, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned

December 22, 2014

Reported from the Committee on Natural Resources with an amendment

[Strike out all after the enacting clause and insert the part printed in italic]

December 22, 2014

The Committee on the Judiciary discharged; committed to the Committee of the Whole House on the State of the Union and ordered to be printed

[For text of introduced bill, see copy of bill as introduced on March 25, 2014]


A BILL

To amend Public Law 94–241 with respect to the Northern Mariana Islands.

Be it enacted by the Senate and House of Representatives of the United States of America in Congress assembled,

SECTION 1. Amendments.

Section 6 of Public Law 94–241 (90 Stat. 263; 122 Stat. 854) is amended—

(1) in subsection (a)(2), by striking “December 31, 2014, except as provided in subsections (b) and (d)” and inserting “December 31, 2019”; and

(2) in subsection (d)—

(A) in the third sentence of paragraph (2), by striking “not to extend beyond December 31, 2014, unless extended pursuant to paragraph 5 of this subsection” and inserting “ending on December 31, 2019”;

(B) by striking paragraph (5); and

(C) by redesignating paragraph (6) as paragraph (5).


Union Calendar No. 529

113th CONGRESS
     2d Session
H. R. 4296
[Report No. 113–698, Part I]

A BILL
To amend Public Law 94–241 with respect to the Northern Mariana Islands.

December 22, 2014
Reported from the Committee on Natural Resources with an amendment
December 22, 2014
The Committee on the Judiciary discharged; committed to the Committee of the Whole House on the State of the Union and ordered to be printed
Share This