Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6]* 03/26/2014
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26] 04/01/2014
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5] 04/03/2014
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 04/08/2014
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11] 04/09/2014
Rep. Griffith, H. Morgan [R-VA-9] 04/09/2014
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 04/10/2014
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5] 04/29/2014
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-16] 05/19/2014
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 05/19/2014
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1] 05/20/2014
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-20] 05/28/2014
Rep. Johnson, Bill [R-OH-6] 05/29/2014
Rep. Harper, Gregg [R-MS-3] 09/08/2014
Rep. Collins, Doug [R-GA-9] 09/08/2014