Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Pearce, Stevan [R-NM-2]* 03/26/2014
Rep. Vela, Filemon [D-TX-34]* 03/26/2014
Rep. Veasey, Marc A. [D-TX-33] 03/28/2014
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 04/01/2014
Rep. Vargas, Juan [D-CA-51] 04/03/2014
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 04/08/2014
Rep. DelBene, Suzan K. [D-WA-1] 05/06/2014
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 06/25/2014