Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Black, Diane [R-TN-6]* 03/26/2014
Rep. McHenry, Patrick T. [R-NC-10]* 03/26/2014
Rep. Mulvaney, Mick [R-SC-5]* 03/26/2014
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8]* 03/26/2014
Rep. Flores, Bill [R-TX-17]* 03/26/2014
Rep. Luetkemeyer, Blaine [R-MO-3]* 03/26/2014
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1]* 03/26/2014
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16]* 03/26/2014
Rep. Byrne, Bradley [R-AL-1]* 03/26/2014
Rep. Lankford, James [R-OK-5]* 03/26/2014
Rep. Lummis, Cynthia M. [R-WY-At Large]* 03/26/2014
Rep. Scott, Austin [R-GA-8]* 03/26/2014
Rep. Huizenga, Bill [R-MI-2]* 03/26/2014
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5]* 03/26/2014
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7]* 03/26/2014
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-8]* 03/26/2014
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32]* 03/26/2014
Rep. Hudson, Richard [R-NC-8]* 03/26/2014
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6]* 03/26/2014
Rep. Duncan, Jeff [R-SC-3]* 03/26/2014
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2]* 03/26/2014
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1]* 03/26/2014
Rep. Rice, Tom [R-SC-7]* 03/26/2014
Rep. Bentivolio, Kerry L. [R-MI-11]* 03/26/2014
Rep. Salmon, Matt [R-AZ-5]* 03/26/2014
Rep. Rooney, Thomas J. [R-FL-17]* 03/26/2014
Rep. Yoho, Ted S. [R-FL-3]* 03/26/2014
Rep. Weber, Randy K. Sr. [R-TX-14]* 03/26/2014
Rep. Harris, Andy [R-MD-1]* 03/26/2014
Rep. DesJarlais, Scott [R-TN-4]* 03/26/2014
Rep. Huelskamp, Tim [R-KS-1] 03/27/2014
Rep. Fincher, Stephen Lee [R-TN-8] 03/27/2014
Rep. Williams, Roger [R-TX-25] 03/27/2014
Rep. Hartzler, Vicky [R-MO-4] 03/27/2014
Rep. Olson, Pete [R-TX-22] 03/27/2014
Rep. Stewart, Chris [R-UT-2] 03/27/2014
Rep. Tipton, Scott R. [R-CO-3] 04/02/2014
Rep. Schweikert, David [R-AZ-6] 04/02/2014
Rep. Fleming, John [R-LA-4] 04/02/2014
Rep. Pittenger, Robert [R-NC-9] 04/02/2014
Rep. Pearce, Stevan [R-NM-2] 04/02/2014
Rep. Cramer, Kevin [R-ND-At Large] 04/02/2014
Rep. Bachmann, Michele [R-MN-6] 04/02/2014
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3] 04/03/2014
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2] 04/09/2014
Rep. Collins, Chris [R-NY-27] 04/09/2014
Rep. McClintock, Tom [R-CA-4] 04/09/2014
Rep. Stutzman, Marlin A. [R-IN-3] 04/09/2014
Rep. Cotton, Tom [R-AR-4] 04/28/2014
Rep. Price, Tom [R-GA-6] 04/28/2014
Rep. Meadows, Mark [R-NC-11] 04/28/2014
Rep. Rokita, Todd [R-IN-4] 04/28/2014
Rep. Jordan, Jim [R-OH-4] 05/20/2014