Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-13]* 03/26/2014
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1]* 03/26/2014
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large]* 03/26/2014
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-32]* 03/26/2014
Rep. Kelly, Mike [R-PA-3]* 03/26/2014
Rep. Marino, Tom [R-PA-10]* 03/26/2014
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3]* 03/26/2014
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1]* 03/26/2014
Rep. Barletta, Lou [R-PA-11]* 03/26/2014
Rep. Meadows, Mark [R-NC-11]* 03/26/2014
Rep. Tsongas, Niki [D-MA-3] 03/27/2014
Rep. Fitzpatrick, Michael G. [R-PA-8] 03/27/2014
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10] 04/01/2014
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-27] 04/07/2014
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 04/07/2014
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-2] 04/08/2014
Rep. Noem, Kristi L. [R-SD-At Large] 04/08/2014
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 04/08/2014
Rep. Cramer, Kevin [R-ND-At Large] 04/09/2014
Rep. Perry, Scott [R-PA-4] 04/09/2014
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2] 04/09/2014
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1] 04/10/2014
Rep. Gabbard, Tulsi [D-HI-2] 04/28/2014
Rep. Coffman, Mike [R-CO-6] 04/28/2014
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 04/28/2014
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2] 04/28/2014
Rep. Enyart, William L. [D-IL-12] 04/30/2014
Rep. Long, Billy [R-MO-7] 05/07/2014
Rep. Weber, Randy K. Sr. [R-TX-14] 05/07/2014
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-17] 05/09/2014
Rep. Collins, Doug [R-GA-9] 05/09/2014
Rep. Kelly, Robin L. [D-IL-2] 05/09/2014
Rep. Bentivolio, Kerry L. [R-MI-11] 05/19/2014
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-20] 05/20/2014
Rep. Gibson, Christopher P. [R-NY-19] 05/20/2014
Rep. Brownley, Julia [D-CA-26] 05/29/2014
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 06/17/2014
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 07/15/2014
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-15] 11/12/2014
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 12/10/2014