There are 2 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (3)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Reported to House

Workforce Democracy and Fairness Act

Short Titles as Introduced

Workforce Democracy and Fairness Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend the National Labor Relations Act with respect to the timing of elections and pre-election hearings and the identification of pre-election issues.


Actions Overview (2)

Date
12/09/2014Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Education and the Workforce. H. Rept. 113-653.
03/27/2014Introduced in House

All Actions (6)

Date
12/09/2014Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 491.
Action By: House of Representatives
12/09/2014Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Education and the Workforce. H. Rept. 113-653.
04/09/2014Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by the Yeas and Nays: 21 - 14.
04/09/2014Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
03/27/2014Referred to the House Committee on Education and the Workforce.
Action By: House of Representatives
03/27/2014Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (37)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25]* 03/27/2014
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2]* 03/27/2014
Rep. Price, Tom [R-GA-6]* 03/27/2014
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24]* 03/27/2014
Rep. Hunter, Duncan D. [R-CA-50]* 03/27/2014
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1]* 03/27/2014
Rep. Thompson, Glenn [R-PA-5]* 03/27/2014
Rep. Walberg, Tim [R-MI-7]* 03/27/2014
Rep. Salmon, Matt [R-AZ-5]* 03/27/2014
Rep. DesJarlais, Scott [R-TN-4]* 03/27/2014
Rep. Rokita, Todd [R-IN-4]* 03/27/2014
Rep. Bucshon, Larry [R-IN-8]* 03/27/2014
Rep. Gowdy, Trey [R-SC-4]* 03/27/2014
Rep. Brooks, Susan W. [R-IN-5]* 03/27/2014
Rep. Hudson, Richard [R-NC-8]* 03/27/2014
Rep. Messer, Luke [R-IN-6]* 03/27/2014
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11]* 03/27/2014
Rep. Kelly, Mike [R-PA-3]* 03/27/2014
Rep. Ribble, Reid J. [R-WI-8]* 03/27/2014
Rep. Schweikert, David [R-AZ-6]* 03/27/2014
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6] 04/02/2014
Rep. Pearce, Stevan [R-NM-2] 04/02/2014
Rep. Griffin, Tim [R-AR-2] 04/04/2014
Rep. Heck, Joseph J. [R-NV-3] 04/04/2014
Rep. Gibbs, Bob [R-OH-7] 04/08/2014
Rep. Womack, Steve [R-AR-3] 04/10/2014
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 04/28/2014
Rep. Stivers, Steve [R-OH-15] 04/29/2014
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2] 05/01/2014
Rep. Coffman, Mike [R-CO-6] 05/20/2014
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-4] 06/11/2014
Rep. Harris, Andy [R-MD-1] 06/17/2014
Rep. Huelskamp, Tim [R-KS-1] 06/18/2014
Rep. Tipton, Scott R. [R-CO-3] 06/18/2014
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-3] 06/20/2014
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-42] 06/20/2014
Rep. Schock, Aaron [R-IL-18] 07/22/2014

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Education and the Workforce03/27/2014 Referred to
04/09/2014 Markup by
12/09/2014 Reported by H. Rept. 113-653

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (4)


Latest Summary (2)

There are 2 summaries for H.R.4320. View summaries

Shown Here:
Reported to House with amendment(s) (12/09/2014)

Workforce Democracy and Fairness Act - (Sec. 2) Amends the National Labor Relations Act to require the National Labor Relations Board (NLRB) to require that no investigative hearing take place until at least 14 days after the filing of an election petition regarding collective bargaining representation when the NLRB has reasonable cause to believe that the petition raises a question of representation affecting commerce. Requires such hearings to be non-adversarial, and the hearing officer, in collaboration with the parties, to identify any relevant and material pre-election issues.

Requires the NLRB, in cases where it finds that a question of representation exists, to: (1) direct an election by secret ballot as soon as practicable but not before 35 calendar days after the filing of the election petition, and (2) certify election results only after it has ruled on each pre-election issue not resolved before the election and any additional issue pertaining to the conduct or results of that election.

(Sec. 3) Revises requirements for determination by the NLRB of an appropriate bargaining unit before an election of collective bargaining representation. (In effect reverses the NLRB's August 26, 2011, decision in Specialty Healthcare and Rehabilitation of Mobile and its June 22, 2011, rulemaking regarding proposed changes to procedures involving the election of collective bargaining representation.)

Replaces the current restriction in the meaning of collective bargaining unit to employer unit, craft unit, plant unit, or subdivision. Requires the NLRB, instead, to determine a unit as appropriate for collective bargaining if it consists of employees that share a sufficient community of interest. Specifies factors the NLRB must consider when making such determinations.

Prohibits exclusion of employees from the unit unless the group's interest are sufficiently distinct from those of other employees to warrant the establishment of a separate unit.