Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25]* 03/27/2014
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2]* 03/27/2014
Rep. Price, Tom [R-GA-6]* 03/27/2014
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24]* 03/27/2014
Rep. Hunter, Duncan D. [R-CA-50]* 03/27/2014
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1]* 03/27/2014
Rep. Thompson, Glenn [R-PA-5]* 03/27/2014
Rep. Walberg, Tim [R-MI-7]* 03/27/2014
Rep. Salmon, Matt [R-AZ-5]* 03/27/2014
Rep. DesJarlais, Scott [R-TN-4]* 03/27/2014
Rep. Rokita, Todd [R-IN-4]* 03/27/2014
Rep. Bucshon, Larry [R-IN-8]* 03/27/2014
Rep. Gowdy, Trey [R-SC-4]* 03/27/2014
Rep. Brooks, Susan W. [R-IN-5]* 03/27/2014
Rep. Hudson, Richard [R-NC-8]* 03/27/2014
Rep. Messer, Luke [R-IN-6]* 03/27/2014
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11]* 03/27/2014
Rep. Kelly, Mike [R-PA-3]* 03/27/2014
Rep. Ribble, Reid J. [R-WI-8]* 03/27/2014
Rep. Schweikert, David [R-AZ-6]* 03/27/2014
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6] 04/02/2014
Rep. Pearce, Stevan [R-NM-2] 04/02/2014
Rep. Griffin, Tim [R-AR-2] 04/04/2014
Rep. Heck, Joseph J. [R-NV-3] 04/04/2014
Rep. Gibbs, Bob [R-OH-7] 04/08/2014
Rep. Womack, Steve [R-AR-3] 04/10/2014
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 04/28/2014
Rep. Stivers, Steve [R-OH-15] 04/29/2014
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2] 05/01/2014
Rep. Coffman, Mike [R-CO-6] 05/20/2014
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-4] 06/11/2014
Rep. Harris, Andy [R-MD-1] 06/17/2014
Rep. Huelskamp, Tim [R-KS-1] 06/18/2014
Rep. Tipton, Scott R. [R-CO-3] 06/18/2014
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-3] 06/20/2014
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-42] 06/20/2014
Rep. Schock, Aaron [R-IL-18] 07/22/2014