Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1]* 03/27/2014
Rep. Bustos, Cheri [D-IL-17]* 03/27/2014
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1]* 03/27/2014
Rep. Ruiz, Raul [D-CA-36]* 03/27/2014
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 03/27/2014
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-24] 04/09/2014
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-40] 04/09/2014
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-9] 04/10/2014
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 04/28/2014
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 04/28/2014
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-17] 04/30/2014
Rep. Swalwell, Eric [D-CA-15] 04/30/2014
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 05/02/2014
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 05/06/2014
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 05/06/2014
Rep. Carney, John C., Jr. [D-DE-At Large] 05/22/2014
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1] 05/29/2014
Rep. Takano, Mark [D-CA-41] 06/12/2014
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-23] 06/17/2014
Rep. Meng, Grace [D-NY-6] 06/18/2014
Rep. Delaney, John K. [D-MD-6] 06/19/2014
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-14] 06/23/2014
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-13] 06/24/2014
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-3] 06/24/2014
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 06/25/2014
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 06/30/2014
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 06/30/2014
Rep. Frankel, Lois [D-FL-22] 07/11/2014
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-5] 07/11/2014
Rep. Clark, Katherine M. [D-MA-5] 07/11/2014
Rep. Cardenas, Tony [D-CA-29] 07/14/2014
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-20] 07/14/2014
Rep. Deutch, Theodore E. [D-FL-21] 07/14/2014
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2] 07/14/2014
Rep. Peters, Scott H. [D-CA-52] 07/15/2014
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 07/16/2014
Rep. Lowenthal, Alan S. [D-CA-47] 07/28/2014
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-25] 07/31/2014