There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Pine Forest Range Recreation Enhancement Act of 2013

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To designate the Pine Forest Range Wilderness area in Humboldt County, Nevada.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
01/29/2013Introduced in House

All Actions (4)

Date
07/23/2013Subcommittee Hearings Held.
Action By: House Natural Resources Subcommittee on Public Lands and Environmental Regulation
02/08/2013Referred to the Subcommittee on Public Lands and Environmental Regulation.
Action By: Committee on Natural Resources
01/29/2013Referred to the House Committee on Natural Resources.
Action By: House of Representatives
01/29/2013Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (3)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Heck, Joseph J. [R-NV-3] 03/12/2013
Rep. Titus, Dina [D-NV-1] 03/12/2013
Rep. Horsford, Steven [D-NV-4] 05/16/2013

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Natural Resources01/29/2013 Referred to
House Natural Resources Subcommittee on Public Lands and Environmental Regulation02/08/2013 Referred to
07/23/2013 Hearings by

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (5)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.433. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (01/29/2013)

Pine Forest Range Recreation Enhancement Act of 2013 - Designates specified federal land managed by the Bureau of Land Management (BLM) in Humboldt County, Nevada, and to be known as the Pine Forest Range Wilderness, as wilderness and as a component of the National Wilderness Preservation System.

Releases BLM land in any part of the Blue Lakes and Alder Creek wilderness study areas not designated as wilderness by this Act from further study for wilderness designation.

Authorizes the Secretary of the Interior to take necessary measures in the wilderness designated by this Act to control fire, insects, and diseases.

Authorizes land exchanges involving identified federal and non-federal lands in Humboldt County. Incorporates acquired lands and interests in or adjoining the Pine Forest Range Wilderness Area into and administered as part of such wilderness area.