Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3]* 03/27/2014
Rep. Young, Todd C. [R-IN-9]* 03/27/2014
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-38] 04/29/2014
Rep. Nunes, Devin [R-CA-22] 05/19/2014
Rep. Schock, Aaron [R-IL-18] 05/19/2014
Rep. Black, Diane [R-TN-6] 06/12/2014
Rep. Kelly, Mike [R-PA-3] 06/17/2014
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 07/08/2014
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1] 07/08/2014
Rep. Rothfus, Keith J. [R-PA-12] 07/31/2014
Rep. Himes, James A. [D-CT-4] 11/17/2014