Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Ribble, Reid J. [R-WI-8]* 03/27/2014
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 04/03/2014
Rep. Byrne, Bradley [R-AL-1] 04/07/2014
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 04/09/2014
Rep. Garamendi, John [D-CA-3] 07/17/2014
Rep. Hanna, Richard L. [R-NY-22] 08/01/2014