Text: H.R.4346 — 113th Congress (2013-2014)All Information (Except Text)

There is one version of the bill.

Text available as:

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (03/27/2014)


113th CONGRESS
2d Session
H. R. 4346


To encourage continued enlargement of the North Atlantic Treaty Organization.


IN THE HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES

March 27, 2014

Mr. Turner (for himself, Mrs. Walorski, Mr. Rangel, Mr. McKeon, Mr. Austin Scott of Georgia, Mr. Shimkus, Mr. Poe of Texas, Mr. Guthrie, Mrs. Miller of Michigan, Mr. Mica, and Mr. Diaz-Balart) introduced the following bill; which was referred to the Committee on Foreign Affairs


A BILL

To encourage continued enlargement of the North Atlantic Treaty Organization.

Be it enacted by the Senate and House of Representatives of the United States of America in Congress assembled,

SECTION 1. Short title.

This Act may be cited as the “NATO Alliance Recognition and Promotion Act”.

SEC. 2. Findings.

Congress finds the following:

(1) On March 12, 2014, the North Atlantic Treaty Organization (NATO) marks the 15th anniversary of enlargement through the accession of 3 Central European countries: the Czech Republic, Poland, and Hungary.

(2) On March 29, 2014, NATO marks the 10th anniversary of enlargement through the accession of 7 Central European countries: Bulgaria, Estonia, Latvia, Lithuania, Romania, Slovakia, and Slovenia.

(3) On April 7, 2014, NATO marks the 5th anniversary of enlargement through the accession of Albania and Croatia.

(4) The incorporation of these European countries into NATO has contributed toward a vision of Europe that is aimed at promoting stability and cooperation, at building a Europe whole and free, united in peace, democracy and common values.

(5) Since joining the Alliance, these 12 member states have contributed to numerous NATO-led peace and security and stability operations, including participation in the International Security Assistance Force’s (ISAF) mission in Afghanistan.

SEC. 3. Statement of Congress.

Congress declares that—

(1) NATO has been the cornerstone of transatlantic security cooperation and an enduring instrument for promoting stability in Europe and around the world for over sixty-five years;

(2) the incorporation of the Czech Republic, Poland, Hungary, Bulgaria, Estonia, Latvia, Lithuania, Romania, Slovakia, Slovenia, Albania, and Croatia has been essential to the success of NATO in this modern era;

(3) the Czech Republic, Poland, Hungary, Bulgaria, Estonia, Latvia, Lithuania, Romania, Slovakia, Slovenia, Albania and Croatia has over time added to and strengthened the list of key European allies of the United States;

(4) since joining NATO, these member states have remained committed to the collective defense of the Alliance and have demonstrated their will and ability to contribute to transatlantic solidarity and assume increasingly more responsibility for international peace and security;

(5) these NATO member states have become reliable partners and supporters of aspiring members, and the United States recognizes their continued efforts to aid in further enlargement initiatives; and

(6) the commitment by these NATO members to Alliance principles and active participation in Alliance initiatives shows the success of NATO’s Open-Door Policy.

SEC. 4. Sense of Congress.

It is the sense of Congress that—

(1) the United States should remain committed to maintaining a military presence in Europe as a means of promoting allied interoperability and providing visible assurance to NATO allies in the region; and

(2) at the September 2014 NATO Summit in Wales, the United States, along with NATO allies, should continue to pursue enlargement initiatives for the aspirant countries.


Share This