Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15]* 04/01/2014
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2]* 04/01/2014
Rep. Fudge, Marcia L. [D-OH-11]* 04/01/2014
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1]* 04/01/2014
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-3]* 04/01/2014
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 04/04/2014
Rep. Swalwell, Eric [D-CA-15] 04/07/2014
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-46] 05/02/2014
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-40] 06/17/2014