Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7]* 04/01/2014
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3] 04/02/2014
Rep. Farenthold, Blake [R-TX-27] 04/04/2014
Rep. Cotton, Tom [R-AR-4] 04/28/2014
Rep. Duncan, Jeff [R-SC-3] 04/30/2014
Rep. Stewart, Chris [R-UT-2] 06/05/2014
Rep. Bridenstine, Jim [R-OK-1] 06/24/2014
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2] 06/24/2014