Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 02/04/2013
Rep. Stivers, Steve [R-OH-15] 02/08/2013
Rep. Valadao, David G. [R-CA-21] 02/08/2013
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-27] 02/25/2013
Rep. Duckworth, Tammy [D-IL-8] 03/12/2013
Rep. Vargas, Juan [D-CA-51] 03/12/2013
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 03/12/2013
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 04/09/2013
Rep. Ryan, Paul [R-WI-1] 04/10/2013
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 05/21/2013
Rep. DelBene, Suzan K. [D-WA-1] 06/28/2013
Rep. Rooney, Thomas J. [R-FL-17] 09/25/2013
Rep. Sinema, Kyrsten [D-AZ-9] 10/22/2013
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 10/22/2013
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 01/15/2014
Rep. Castro, Joaquin [D-TX-20] 01/28/2014
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-2] 04/10/2014