Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Bridenstine, Jim [R-OK-1]* 04/01/2014
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 04/03/2014
Rep. Walorski, Jackie [R-IN-2] 04/03/2014
Rep. DeSantis, Ron [R-FL-6] 04/03/2014
Rep. Posey, Bill [R-FL-8] 04/03/2014
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-4] 04/03/2014
Rep. Weber, Randy K. Sr. [R-TX-14] 04/03/2014
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-8] 04/03/2014
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1] 04/03/2014
Rep. Lummis, Cynthia M. [R-WY-At Large] 04/03/2014
Rep. Farenthold, Blake [R-TX-27] 04/03/2014
Rep. Pittenger, Robert [R-NC-9] 04/03/2014
Rep. Fleming, John [R-LA-4] 04/03/2014
Rep. Harris, Andy [R-MD-1] 04/03/2014
Rep. Yoho, Ted S. [R-FL-3] 04/03/2014
Rep. Scott, Austin [R-GA-8] 04/03/2014
Rep. Huizenga, Bill [R-MI-2] 04/03/2014
Rep. Pearce, Stevan [R-NM-2] 04/03/2014
Rep. Duncan, Jeff [R-SC-3] 04/03/2014
Rep. Salmon, Matt [R-AZ-5] 04/03/2014
Rep. Cramer, Kevin [R-ND-At Large] 04/03/2014
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3] 04/03/2014
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 04/03/2014
Rep. McHenry, Patrick T. [R-NC-10] 04/07/2014
Rep. Duffy, Sean P. [R-WI-7] 04/07/2014
Rep. Cook, Paul [R-CA-8] 04/07/2014
Rep. Lance, Leonard [R-NJ-7] 04/07/2014
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 04/07/2014
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4] 04/07/2014
Rep. LaMalfa, Doug [R-CA-1] 04/07/2014
Rep. Grimm, Michael G. [R-NY-11] 04/07/2014
Rep. Stockman, Steve [R-TX-36] 04/07/2014
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5] 04/07/2014
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5] 04/07/2014
Rep. Buchanan, Vern [R-FL-16] 04/08/2014
Rep. Roskam, Peter J. [R-IL-6] 04/08/2014
Rep. Rogers, Mike D. [R-AL-3] 04/08/2014
Rep. DesJarlais, Scott [R-TN-4] 04/08/2014
Rep. Johnson, Bill [R-OH-6] 04/09/2014
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1] 04/09/2014
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8] 04/09/2014
Rep. Cotton, Tom [R-AR-4] 04/09/2014
Rep. Griffin, Tim [R-AR-2] 04/10/2014
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1] 04/10/2014
Rep. Joyce, David P. [R-OH-14] 04/10/2014
Rep. Campbell, John [R-CA-45] 04/10/2014
Rep. Nunnelee, Alan [R-MS-1] 04/10/2014
Rep. Broun, Paul C. [R-GA-10] 04/10/2014
Rep. Palazzo, Steven M. [R-MS-4] 06/11/2014