Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4]* 01/29/2013
Rep. Alexander, Rodney [R-LA-5]* 01/29/2013
Rep. Amash, Justin [R-MI-3]* 01/29/2013
Rep. Amodei, Mark E. [R-NV-2]* 01/29/2013
Rep. Bachmann, Michele [R-MN-6]* 01/29/2013
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6]* 01/29/2013
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6]* 01/29/2013
Rep. Black, Diane [R-TN-6]* 01/29/2013
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7]* 01/29/2013
Rep. Brooks, Mo [R-AL-5]* 01/29/2013
Rep. Broun, Paul C. [R-GA-10]* 01/29/2013
Rep. Bucshon, Larry [R-IN-8]* 01/29/2013
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26]* 01/29/2013
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-42]* 01/29/2013
Rep. Coffman, Mike [R-CO-6]* 01/29/2013
Rep. DesJarlais, Scott [R-TN-4]* 01/29/2013
Rep. Duncan, Jeff [R-SC-3]* 01/29/2013
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2]* 01/29/2013
Rep. Fincher, Stephen Lee [R-TN-8]* 01/29/2013
Rep. Fleischmann, Charles J. "Chuck" [R-TN-3]* 01/29/2013
Rep. Fortenberry, Jeff [R-NE-1]* 01/29/2013
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5]* 01/29/2013
Rep. Gosar, Paul A. [R-AZ-4]* 01/29/2013
Rep. Harper, Gregg [R-MS-3]* 01/29/2013
Rep. Huelskamp, Tim [R-KS-1]* 01/29/2013
Rep. Huizenga, Bill [R-MI-2]* 01/29/2013
Rep. Hurt, Robert [R-VA-5]* 01/29/2013
Rep. Jordan, Jim [R-OH-4]* 01/29/2013
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-4]* 01/29/2013
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5]* 01/29/2013
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-31]* 01/29/2013
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1]* 01/29/2013
Rep. Mulvaney, Mick [R-SC-5]* 01/29/2013
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19]* 01/29/2013
Rep. Nunnelee, Alan [R-MS-1]* 01/29/2013
Rep. Palazzo, Steven M. [R-MS-4]* 01/29/2013
Rep. Pearce, Stevan [R-NM-2]* 01/29/2013
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2]* 01/29/2013
Rep. Ribble, Reid J. [R-WI-8]* 01/29/2013
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1]* 01/29/2013
Rep. Ross, Dennis A. [R-FL-15]* 01/29/2013
Rep. Scalise, Steve [R-LA-1]* 01/29/2013
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-5]* 01/29/2013
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32]* 01/29/2013
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21]* 01/29/2013
Rep. Stivers, Steve [R-OH-15]* 01/29/2013
Rep. Stutzman, Marlin A. [R-IN-3]* 01/29/2013
Rep. Thompson, Glenn [R-PA-5]* 01/29/2013
Rep. Thornberry, Mac [R-TX-13]* 01/29/2013
Rep. Webster, Daniel [R-FL-10]* 01/29/2013
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3]* 01/29/2013
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2]* 01/29/2013
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10]* 01/29/2013
Rep. Womack, Steve [R-AR-3]* 01/29/2013
Rep. Young, Todd C. [R-IN-9]* 01/29/2013
Rep. Farenthold, Blake [R-TX-27] 02/06/2013
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-8] 02/06/2013
Rep. Walberg, Tim [R-MI-7] 02/06/2013
Rep. Crenshaw, Ander [R-FL-4] 02/06/2013
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2] 02/06/2013
Rep. Young, C. W. Bill [R-FL-13] 02/06/2013
Rep. Benishek, Dan [R-MI-1] 02/06/2013
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 02/06/2013
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4] 02/06/2013
Rep. Mullin, Markwayne [R-OK-2] 02/06/2013
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1] 02/06/2013
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4] 02/06/2013
Rep. Bilirakis, Gus M. [R-FL-12] 02/06/2013
Rep. Cotton, Tom [R-AR-4] 02/06/2013
Rep. Perry, Scott [R-PA-4] 02/25/2013
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 02/25/2013
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 02/25/2013
Rep. Barr, Andy [R-KY-6] 02/25/2013
Rep. Gardner, Cory [R-CO-4] 02/25/2013
Rep. Meadows, Mark [R-NC-11] 02/25/2013
Rep. Pittenger, Robert [R-NC-9] 02/25/2013
Rep. Holding, George [R-NC-13] 04/12/2013
Rep. Rooney, Thomas J. [R-FL-17] 04/12/2013
Rep. Smith, Adrian [R-NE-3] 04/12/2013
Rep. Luetkemeyer, Blaine [R-MO-3] 04/12/2013
Rep. Stockman, Steve [R-TX-36] 04/12/2013
Rep. Price, Tom [R-GA-6] 04/12/2013
Rep. Lummis, Cynthia M. [R-WY-At Large] 05/16/2013
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 05/16/2013
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 05/16/2013
Rep. Radel, Trey [R-FL-19] 05/16/2013
Rep. Bentivolio, Kerry L. [R-MI-11] 05/16/2013
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 05/16/2013
Rep. Griffin, Tim [R-AR-2] 05/16/2013
Rep. Cramer, Kevin [R-ND-At Large] 05/16/2013
Rep. Graves, Sam [R-MO-6] 05/16/2013
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 06/05/2013
Rep. Lankford, James [R-OK-5] 06/05/2013
Rep. Hartzler, Vicky [R-MO-4] 06/05/2013
Rep. Hensarling, Jeb [R-TX-5] 06/26/2013
Rep. Smith, Jason T. [R-MO-8] 06/26/2013
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5] 06/26/2013
Rep. Hanna, Richard L. [R-NY-22] 06/26/2013
Rep. Heck, Joseph J. [R-NV-3] 06/26/2013
Rep. Hunter, Duncan D. [R-CA-50] 06/26/2013
Rep. Pompeo, Mike [R-KS-4] 07/23/2013
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7] 07/23/2013
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [R-TX-4] 07/23/2013
Rep. Jenkins, Lynn [R-KS-2] 07/23/2013
Rep. Boustany, Charles W., Jr. [R-LA-3] 07/23/2013
Rep. Graves, Tom [R-GA-14] 07/31/2013
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8] 07/31/2013
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10] 07/31/2013
Rep. Cassidy, Bill [R-LA-6] 07/31/2013
Rep. Crawford, Eric A. "Rick" [R-AR-1] 07/31/2013
Rep. DeSantis, Ron [R-FL-6] 07/31/2013
Rep. Stewart, Chris [R-UT-2] 07/31/2013
Rep. Flores, Bill [R-TX-17] 07/31/2013
Rep. Scott, Austin [R-GA-8] 07/31/2013
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11] 07/31/2013
Rep. Chaffetz, Jason [R-UT-3] 08/02/2013
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-48] 08/02/2013
Rep. Paulsen, Erik [R-MN-3] 08/02/2013
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1] 08/02/2013
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1] 08/02/2013
Rep. Ellmers, Renee L. [R-NC-2] 08/02/2013
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 08/02/2013
Rep. Olson, Pete [R-TX-22] 09/10/2013
Rep. Schweikert, David [R-AZ-6] 09/10/2013
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31] 09/10/2013
Rep. McHenry, Patrick T. [R-NC-10] 01/28/2014