There are 5 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To designate the facility of the United States Forest Service for the Grandfather Ranger District located at 109 Lawing Drive in Nebo, North Carolina, as the "Jason Crisp Forest Service Building".


Actions Overview (6)

Date Actions Overview
08/08/2014Became Public Law No: 113-155. (TXT | PDF)
08/08/2014Signed by President.
08/04/2014Presented to President.
07/31/2014Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent.(consideration: CR 8/1/2014 S5312)
06/17/2014Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote.(text: CR H5384)
04/01/2014Introduced in House

All Actions (14)

Date Chamber All Actions
08/08/2014Became Public Law No: 113-155. (TXT | PDF)
08/08/2014Signed by President.
08/04/2014HousePresented to President.
08/01/2014SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
07/31/2014SenatePassed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR 8/1/2014 S5312)
06/18/2014SenateReceived in the Senate, read twice.
06/17/2014-4:15pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
06/17/2014-4:15pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H5384)
06/17/2014-4:06pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 4360.
06/17/2014-4:06pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H5384-5385)
06/17/2014-4:06pmHouseMr. Benishek moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
04/22/2014HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Conservation, Energy, and Forestry.
Action By: Committee on Agriculture
04/01/2014HouseReferred to the House Committee on Agriculture.
04/01/2014HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (11)


Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Related Documents
House Agriculture04/01/2014 Referred to
House Agriculture Subcommittee on Conservation, Energy, and Forestry04/22/2014 Referred to

No related bill information was received for H.R.4360.


Subjects (4)


Latest Summary (4)

There are 4 summaries for H.R.4360. View summaries

Shown Here:
Public Law No: 113-155 (08/08/2014)

(This measure has not been amended since it was introduced. The summary of that version is repeated here.)

Designates the facility of the Grandfather Ranger District of the U.S. Forest Service located at 109 Lawing Drive in Nebo, North Carolina, as the "Jason Crisp Forest Service Building."