Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Deutch, Theodore E. [D-FL-21]* 04/01/2014
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 04/10/2014
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 05/20/2014
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 06/09/2014
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1] 06/20/2014
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1] 07/10/2014
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 07/17/2014
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-14] 12/02/2014