Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-1]* 04/02/2014
Rep. Kelly, Mike [R-PA-3]* 04/02/2014
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3]* 04/02/2014
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12]* 04/02/2014
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-13]* 04/02/2014
Rep. Reed, Tom [R-NY-23]* 04/02/2014
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 04/02/2014
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5]* 04/02/2014
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-20] 04/04/2014
Rep. Stivers, Steve [R-OH-15] 04/04/2014
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 04/10/2014
Rep. Richmond, Cedric L. [D-LA-2] 04/10/2014
Rep. Paulsen, Erik [R-MN-3] 04/10/2014
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 04/10/2014
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 04/10/2014
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13] 04/10/2014
Rep. Kilmer, Derek [D-WA-6] 04/10/2014
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-40] 04/10/2014
Rep. Enyart, William L. [D-IL-12] 04/28/2014
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 04/28/2014
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1] 04/28/2014
Rep. Fudge, Marcia L. [D-OH-11] 04/28/2014
Rep. Turner, Michael R. [R-OH-10] 04/28/2014
Rep. Marino, Tom [R-PA-10] 04/28/2014
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 04/28/2014
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 04/29/2014
Rep. Boustany, Charles W., Jr. [R-LA-3] 04/29/2014
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-26] 05/01/2014
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-5] 05/01/2014
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 05/01/2014
Rep. Joyce, David P. [R-OH-14] 05/01/2014
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 05/01/2014
Rep. Crenshaw, Ander [R-FL-4] 05/01/2014
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1] 05/01/2014
Rep. Schock, Aaron [R-IL-18] 05/06/2014
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1] 05/06/2014
Rep. Vargas, Juan [D-CA-51] 05/06/2014
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2] 05/06/2014
Rep. Kuster, Ann M. [D-NH-2] 05/06/2014
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1] 05/06/2014
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4] 05/07/2014
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-13] 05/15/2014
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Mario [R-FL-25] 05/15/2014
Rep. Hanna, Richard L. [R-NY-22] 05/19/2014
Rep. Peters, Gary C. [D-MI-14] 05/19/2014
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-7] 05/19/2014
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-9] 05/20/2014
Rep. Daines, Steve [R-MT-At Large] 05/20/2014
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 05/21/2014
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 05/21/2014
Rep. Frankel, Lois [D-FL-22] 05/22/2014
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-3] 05/23/2014
Rep. Gibson, Christopher P. [R-NY-19] 05/29/2014
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 05/29/2014
Rep. Johnson, Bill [R-OH-6] 06/02/2014
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 06/05/2014
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-7] 06/05/2014
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6] 06/05/2014
Rep. Buchanan, Vern [R-FL-16] 06/09/2014
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 06/10/2014
Rep. Brooks, Susan W. [R-IN-5] 06/10/2014
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-9] 06/10/2014
Rep. Nolan, Richard M. [D-MN-8] 06/11/2014
Rep. Jeffries, Hakeem S. [D-NY-8] 06/12/2014
Rep. Renacci, James B. [R-OH-16] 06/19/2014
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-14] 06/23/2014
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-32] 06/25/2014
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 06/25/2014
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2] 06/30/2014
Rep. Beatty, Joyce [D-OH-3] 07/08/2014
Rep. Murphy, Patrick [D-FL-18] 07/10/2014
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 07/14/2014
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 07/15/2014
Rep. Sinema, Kyrsten [D-AZ-9] 07/15/2014
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-13] 07/23/2014
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-5] 07/24/2014
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 07/30/2014
Rep. Cartwright, Matt [D-PA-17] 07/30/2014
Rep. Maloney, Sean Patrick [D-NY-18] 09/18/2014
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 11/20/2014